Florida Middle District Court
Judge:John Antoon II
Referred: Leslie Hoffman Price
Case #: 6:25-cv-00183
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Feb 04, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 22, 2025 11:20 AM EDT
Defendant
Foremost Insurance Company, Grand Rapids, Michigan
Represented By
Carolin Angeny Pacheco
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin
contact info
Michael A. Packer
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin
contact info
Plaintiff
Edwin Barreto
Represented By
Leslie Cabrera
Cj Law Firm, P.A.
contact info
Nelson Crespo
Cj Law Firm P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
33 33 1 pgs order Order on Ex Parte Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 05/07 1:07 PM
ORDER granting 27 Joint Motion to Change Mediator. Frank Allocca is substituted as the mediator in this case in the place of James K. Powers. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 5/7/2025. (EK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
34 34 minutes Show Cause Hearing Thu 05/08 7:10 AM
Minute Entry. In Person. Jessica Tome appeared telephonically. Proceedings held before Judge John Antoon II: SHOW CAUSE HEARING held on 5/6/2025. Court Reporter: Nikki L. Peters (KLD) Modified on 5/8/2025, edit text (KLD)
Related: [-]
32 32 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Telephonically / Video Tue 05/06 11:00 AM
ORDER granting 31 Motion to Appear Virtually. Plaintiff's counsel, Jessica Tome, shall call 1-855-244-8681 five minutes before the hearing is scheduled to begin. Access Code: 2300-387-6290. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 5/6/2025. (KLD)
Related: [-]
31 31 motion Appear Telephonically / Video Tue 05/06 10:16 AM
Emergency MOTION for Jessica Tome, Esquire to appear by video by Edwin Barreto. (Tome, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 03, 2025
30 30 misc Response to order to show cause Sat 05/03 10:46 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re25 Order filed by Edwin Barreto. (Tome, Jessica)
Related: [-]
29 29 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Sat 05/03 10:42 PM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on August 28th, 2025, at 2:00 PM before Frank J Allocca, Esquire. (Tome, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
28 28 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 05/02 9:44 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Jessica Tome of Local Rule 2.01(b)(2)(B), which requires members of the Middle District bar to maintain with the clerk a current telephone number, mailing address, and email address. Update your contact information for the Middle District through PACER. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
26 26 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Thu 05/01 2:17 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Jessica Tome on behalf of Edwin Barreto. Lead Counsel: Jessica Tome, Esquire. (Tome, Jessica)
Related: [-]
25 25 1 pgs order Order Thu 05/01 2:04 PM
ORDER and NOTICE OF HEARING. Plaintiff's designated lead counsel, Nelson Crespo, shall appear in person on Tuesday, May 6, 2025, at 3:00 p.m. and SHOW CAUSE why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to comply with Court orders. See Order for details. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 5/1/2025. (EK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
24 24 2 pgs order Order Tue 04/22 3:17 PM
ORDER that Plaintiff shall file a Notice of Mediation no later than April 25, 2025. See Order for details. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 4/22/2025. (EK)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
23 23 adr Notice of selection of mediator Mon 04/21 10:36 AM
NOTICE OF SELECTION of Frank J. Allocca, Esquire as mediator by Edwin Barreto. (Camejo, Carlos)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
22 22 1 pgs order Order Thu 04/10 1:03 PM
ORDER that Plaintiff shall file a Notice of Mediation no later than April 18, 2025. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 4/10/2025. (EK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
21 21 order Standing Order Wed 03/26 9:57 AM
STANDING ORDER on Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 2/7/2022. (MKH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
20 20 order Case Management Scheduling Order Tue 03/25 4:24 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Discovery due by 6/30/2026. Pretrial statement due by 10/16/2026. Jury Trial set for 12/1/2026 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 6 B before Judge John Antoon II. Conduct mediation hearing by 9/1/2026. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. See Order for other deadlines. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 3/25/2025. (EK)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
19 19 misc Case Management Report Fri 03/21 12:41 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Crespo, Nelson)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
18 18 1 pgs order Order Thu 03/20 2:12 PM
ORDER. The parties shall file a Case Management Report no later than March 26, 2025. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 3/19/2025. (KLD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
17 17 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 03/13 8:58 AM
SECOND NOTICE TO COUNSEL Leslie Cabrera of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ARL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
16 16 notice Compliance notice Wed 03/12 2:53 PM
NOTICE of compliance re14 Order,15 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Edwin Barreto (Crespo, Nelson)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 03/12 2:49 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement Amended by Edwin Barreto. (Crespo, Nelson)
Related: [-]
14 14 2 pgs order Order Wed 03/12 12:56 PM
ORDER that Plaintiff shall file an amended disclosure statement no later than March 19, 2025. See Order for details. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 3/12/2025. (EK)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
13 13 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 03/10 3:49 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Edwin Barreto. (Crespo, Nelson)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Mon 03/10 12:12 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Foremost Insurance Company, Grand Rapids, Michigan. (Pacheco, Carolin)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
11 11 3 pgs order Order Mon 03/03 9:40 AM
ORDER that Defendant shall file an amended disclosure statement no later than March 10, 2025. See Order for details. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 3/3/2025. (EK)
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs order Order Mon 03/03 9:39 AM
ORDER that Plaintiff shall file a disclosure statement no later than March 10, 2025. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 3/3/2025. (EK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Wed 02/12 3:00 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Nelson Crespo on behalf of Edwin Barreto. Lead Counsel: Nelson Crespo, Esquire. (Crespo, Nelson)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of a Related Action Tue 02/11 3:16 PM
NOTICE of a related action of Pendency of Other Actions per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Foremost Insurance Company, Grand Rapids, Michigan. Related case(s): Yes (Pacheco, Carolin)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Tue 02/11 3:11 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Foremost Insurance Company, Grand Rapids, Michigan identifying Other Affiliate Farmers Insurance Exchange, Other Affiliate Fire Insurance Exchange, Other Affiliate Truck Insurance Exchange for Foremost Insurance Company, Grand Rapids, Michigan.. (Pacheco, Carolin)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 02/11 3:00 PM
Defendant, Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Foremost Insurance Company, Grand Rapids, Michigan.(Pacheco, Carolin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
5 5 order Interested Persons Order Thu 02/06 9:30 AM
INITIAL CASE ORDER - Notice of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Counsel have 7 days from the date of this order to file their disclosure statement (if not already filed) and to notify the court of a related action (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 2/6/2025. (KLD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
4 4 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 02/05 2:18 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John Antoon II and Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. New case number: 6:25-cv-183-JA-LHP. (TNP)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 02/05 2:14 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Leslie Cabrera of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TNP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
2 2 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Tue 02/04 4:29 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Carolin Angeny Pacheco on behalf of Foremost Insurance Company, Grand Rapids, Michigan. Lead Counsel: Carolin A. Pacheco, Esq.. (Pacheco, Carolin)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 02/04 4:13 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL From State Court from Osceola Circuit Court, case number 2025-CA-000063 OC filed in State Court on 01/08/2025. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-22984277 filed by Foremost Insurance Company, Grand Rapids, Michigan.(Pacheco, Carolin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court COMPLAINT Complaint with Exhibits,
Att: 2 State Court Docket Sheet,
Att: 3 State Court Other Documents,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet