Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:James D Cain, Jr
Referred: Thomas P Leblanc
Case #: 2:25-cv-00121
Nature of Suit340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine
Cause46:30501 Exoneration & Limitation of Liability
Case Filed:Feb 04, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 22, 2025 4:17 AM CDT
Claimant
B & S Equipment Inc
Represented By
Todd A Delcambre
Lebas Law Offices
contact info
Henry H LeBas
Lebas Law Offices
contact info
Claimant
Bayou Boys Boat Rental L L C
Represented By
Austin Story Glascoe
Jones Walker (no)
contact info
Jefferson R Tillery
Jones Walker (no)
contact info
Sara Barry Kuebel
Jones Walker (no)
contact info
Claimant
Troy Construction L L C
Represented By
Charles A Mouton
Mahtook & Lafleur (laf)
contact info
Jared Luke Foti
Mahtook & Lafleur (laf)
contact info
Richard J Hymel
Mahtook & Lafleur (laf)
contact info
Counter Claimant
Bayou Boys Boat Rental, LLC
Represented By
Austin Story Glascoe
Jones Walker (no)
contact info
Jefferson R Tillery
Jones Walker (no)
contact info
Sara Barry Kuebel
Jones Walker (no)
contact info
Counter Defendant
Troy Construction L L C
Represented By
Charles A Mouton
Mahtook & Lafleur (laf)
contact info
Jared Luke Foti
Mahtook & Lafleur (laf)
contact info
Richard J Hymel
Mahtook & Lafleur (laf)
contact info
Cross Claimant
Troy Construction L L C
Represented By
Charles A Mouton
Mahtook & Lafleur (laf)
contact info
Jared Luke Foti
Mahtook & Lafleur (laf)
contact info
Richard J Hymel
Mahtook & Lafleur (laf)
contact info
Cross Defendant
B & S Equipment Inc
Represented By
Todd A Delcambre
Lebas Law Offices
contact info
Henry H LeBas
Lebas Law Offices
contact info
Defendant
B & S Equipment Inc
Represented By
Todd A Delcambre
Lebas Law Offices
contact info
Henry H LeBas
Lebas Law Offices
contact info
Defendant
Bayou Boys Boat Rental L L C
Represented By
Austin Story Glascoe
Jones Walker (no)
contact info
Jefferson R Tillery
Jones Walker (no)
contact info
Sara Barry Kuebel
Jones Walker (no)
contact info
Defendant
Troy Construction L L C
Represented By
Charles A Mouton
Mahtook & Lafleur (laf)
contact info
Jared Luke Foti
Mahtook & Lafleur (laf)
contact info
Richard J Hymel
Mahtook & Lafleur (laf)
contact info
In Re
B & S Equipment Inc
Represented By
Todd A Delcambre
Lebas Law Offices
contact info
Henry H LeBas
Lebas Law Offices
contact info
In Re
Bayou Boys Boat Rental, LLC
Represented By
Austin Story Glascoe
Jones Walker (no)
contact info
Jefferson R Tillery
Jones Walker (no)
contact info
Sara Barry Kuebel
Jones Walker (no)
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Cross Claimant
Troy Construction L L C Texas
Terminated: 02/14/2025
Represented By
Charles A Mouton
Mahtook & Lafleur (laf)
contact info
Jared Luke Foti
Mahtook & Lafleur (laf)
contact info
Richard J Hymel
Mahtook & Lafleur (laf)
contact info
Defendant
Troy Construction L L C Texas
Terminated: 02/14/2025
Represented By
Charles A Mouton
Mahtook & Lafleur (laf)
contact info
Jared Luke Foti
Mahtook & Lafleur (laf)
contact info
Richard J Hymel
Mahtook & Lafleur (laf)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
60 60 motion Leave to File Document Fri 05/02 1:54 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief re44 Motion to Lift Stay by Jeremy Smith. Motions referred to Thomas P LeBlanc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/2/2025.(aty,Toups, Mitchell) Modified on 5/2/2025 to create docket entry relationship and modify docket text. (Crick, S)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Reply Brief,
Att: 2 Proposed order
utility Motions Transferred Fri 05/02 2:26 PM
Motions Transferred regarding60 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief ISO Motion to Lift Stay subject to and without Waiving his Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(3) with consent sought but not yet obtained . Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. (crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
59 59 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 05/01 2:21 PM
ORDER granting57 Motion to Adopt Opposition. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 5/1/2025. (crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
58 58 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/30 4:45 PM
ORDER granting46 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Jonathan Taylor Pace for Franklin Rivas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc on 4/30/2025. (crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]
57 57 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 04/30 2:15 PM
MOTION Motion to Adopt Opposition re56 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, by Bayou Boys Boat Rental L L C. Motions referred to Thomas P LeBlanc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/30/2025.(aty,Tillery, Jefferson)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
56 56 2 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Wed 04/30 1:26 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re44 MOTION to Lift Stay Subject to and Without Waiving Motion to Transfer Venue Per FRCP 12(b)(3) ,54 MOTION to Lift Stay Subject to and Without Waiving Motion to Transfer Venue filed by B & S Equipment Inc. (aty,LeBas, Henry)
Related: [-]
55 55 notice Notice of Motion Setting Wed 04/30 10:12 AM
NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding:54 MOTION to Lift Stay Subject to and Without Waiving Motion to Transfer Venue . Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. Motion day set for 6/25/2025 before Judge James D Cain Jr. (crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]
54 54 motion Lift Stay Wed 04/30 9:44 AM
MOTION to Lift Stay Subject to and Without Waiving Motion to Transfer Venue by Franklin Rivas. Motions referred to Thomas P LeBlanc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/30/2025.(aty,Sartin, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum / Brief Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Stipulations of Clamant Franklin Rivas,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Rivas' Anticipated State Court Petition,
Att: 4 Proposed order
utility Motions Transferred Wed 04/30 2:34 PM
Motions Transferred regarding57 MOTION Motion to Adopt Opposition re56 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, . Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. (crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
53 53 notice Notice of Motion Setting Tue 04/29 9:39 AM
NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding:47 MOTION to Transfer Case . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc. (crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
52 52 motion Lift Stay Mon 04/28 3:56 PM
MOTION to Lift Stay (Supplement to Memorandum In Support of Motion to Lift Stay subject to and Without Waiving Motion to Transfer Venue) by Jeremy Smith. Motions referred to Thomas P LeBlanc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/28/2025.(aty,Toups, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jonathan Taylor Pace
51 51 respoth Admiralty Answer to Complaint Mon 04/28 3:36 PM
ADMIRALTY ANSWER to Complaint of B&S Equipment Co., Inc. by Franklin Rivas. (aty,Sartin, Justin)
Related: [-]
50 50 respoth Admiralty Answer to Complaint Mon 04/28 3:32 PM
ADMIRALTY ANSWER to Complaint of Bayou Boys Boat Rental, LLC by Franklin Rivas. (aty,Sartin, Justin)
Related: [-]
49 49 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/28 3:24 PM
NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties by Franklin Rivas (aty,Sartin, Justin)
Related: [-]
48 48 respoth Admiralty Claim Mon 04/28 3:19 PM
ADMIRALTY CLAIM by Franklin Rivas. (aty,Sartin, Justin)
Related: [-]
47 47 motion Transfer Case Mon 04/28 3:07 PM
MOTION to Transfer Case by Franklin Rivas. Motions referred to Thomas P LeBlanc.(aty,Sartin, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum / Brief Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury and Emails,
Att: 3 Proposed order
46 46 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/28 2:52 PM
Ex Parte MOTION for Jonathan Taylor Pace to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-6256256) by Franklin Rivas. Motions referred to Thomas P LeBlanc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/28/2025.(Attorney Justin Cole Sartin added to party Franklin Rivas(pty:clm))(aty,Sartin, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1- Affidavit of Jonathan Taylor Pace,
Att: 2 Proposed order
45 45 order Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 04/28 10:22 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER re44 MOTION to Lift Stay Subject to and Without Waiving Motion to Transfer Venue Per FRCP 12(b)(3) filed by Jeremy Smith: Responses due by 4/30/2025. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 4/28/2025. (crt,Higgins, M)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Corrective Action Tue 04/29 9:48 AM
NOTICE of Corrective Action to Mitchell A Toups on behalf of Jeremy Smith regarding52 MOTION to Lift Stay (Supplement to Memorandum In Support of Motion to Lift Stay subject to and Without Waiving Motion to Transfer Venue) . Action taken: Terminated52 Motion to Life Stay. Supplemental Memorandum submtted electronically in error as motion. (crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
44 44 motion Lift Stay Fri 04/25 3:31 PM
MOTION to Lift Stay Subject to and Without Waiving Motion to Transfer Venue Per FRCP 12(b)(3) by Jeremy Smith. Motions referred to Thomas P LeBlanc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/25/2025.(aty,Toups, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum / Brief Memorandum in Support of Motion to Lift Stay Subject to Motion to Transfer Venue,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Stipulations of Claimant Jeremy Smith,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Proposed Plaintiffs Original Petition,
Att: 4 Proposed order Proposed Order
43 43 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 04/25 3:13 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re26 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(3) filed by Jeremy Smith. (aty,Toups, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Transferred Fri 04/25 4:01 PM
Motions Transferred regarding44 MOTION to Lift Stay Subject to and Without Waiving Motion to Transfer Venue Per FRCP 12(b)(3) . Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. (crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]