Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Jeremy D Kernodle
Referred: John D Love
Case #: 6:25-cv-00037
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Feb 04, 2025
Terminated:Feb 17, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 23, 2025 4:46 AM CDT
Defendant
Longview Social Security Office
Interested Party
Social Security Administration - Interested Party
Plaintiff
Author James Manning, Jr
9798 County Road 165 North
Overton, TX 75684


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 04/23 10:42 AM
ORDER denying12 Motion for Extension of Time. ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall not accept from Plaintiff Author Manning, any further documents, pleadings, motions, or correspondence in this case except for a (1) a notice of appeal; and an (2) application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis connected to such notice of appeal. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 4/23/2025. (gsm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Tue 04/22 12:03 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File objections by Author James Manning, Jr. (gsm)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
11 11 misc Mail Returned Undeliverable Tue 04/22 10:10 AM
Mail sent to Arthur Manning Jr returned as undeliverable re10 Order on Motion to Reopen Case. (gsm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Reopen Case Tue 03/25 2:58 PM
ORDER terminating9 Motion to Reopen Case. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 3/25/2025. (gsm)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
9 9 motion Reopen Case Mon 03/24 3:22 PM
MOTION to Reopen Case by Author James Manning, Jr. (jbe)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
8 8 order Judgment Tue 02/18 10:46 AM
FINAL JUDGMENT against Author James Manning, Jr (Motion(s)2 ,6 terminated). Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 2/17/25. (jbe)
Related: [-]
7 7 5 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Tue 02/18 10:39 AM
ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations for4 Report and Recommendations (Motion(s)4 terminated). Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 2/17/25. (jbe)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
6 6 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 02/12 2:11 PM
MOTION to file by email by Author James Manning, Jr. (gsm)
Related: [-]
5 5 respoth Objection to Report and Recommendations Wed 02/12 12:17 PM
OBJECTION to4 Report and Recommendations by Author James Manning, Jr. (gsm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
4 4 motion Report and Recommendations Thu 02/06 1:02 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Complaint, filed by Author James Manning, Jr. Objections due within 14 days of receipt. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 2/6/2025. (gsm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
3 3 utility Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Wed 02/05 9:22 AM
Case referred to Magistrate Judge Love (gsm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 02/04 5:09 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Author James Manning, Jr. (gsm)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/04 5:07 PM
COMPLAINT against Longview Social Security Office, filed by Author James Manning, Jr.(gsm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13,
Att: 14 Exhibit 14,
Att: 15 Exhibit 15,
Att: 16 Exhibit 16,
Att: 17 Exhibit 17
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 02/04 5:09 PM
Magistrate Judge John D. Love added. (gsm)
Related: [-]