California Central District Court
Judge:Shashi H Kewalramani
Case #: 5:25-cv-00313
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Feb 04, 2025
Terminated:Apr 03, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 22, 2025 3:39 AM PDT
Defendant
Island Auto Parts Warehouse, Inc.
Defendant
Transtar Properties, LLC
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Darwin Boggs
Represented By
Jason J Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason T Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
13 13 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Fri 05/02 3:47 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Darwin Boggs. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
12 12 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Thu 04/03 4:31 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani, re: Notice of Settlement11 . The Court ORDERS that that: (1) all hearings and deadlines be VACATED; (2) in the interest of judicial economy, the action be ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED; and (3) Plaintiff file an executed Stipulation of Dismissal of the entire action with prejudice once the settlement agreement is executed between the parties, but no later than May 5, 2025. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (hr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
11 11 notice Settlement Wed 04/02 10:01 AM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by plaintiff Darwin Boggs. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
10 10 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 04/01 10:46 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani.Accordingly, Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing by April 8, 2025,why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. (dc)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
9 9 textonly MJDAP Opt-Out Expired Fri 03/14 4:50 PM
The period to decline consent to a magistrate judge has expired. No timely declination of consent has been received by the Court. Each party is deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge for all purposes pursuant to the Local Rules. The case shall now proceed before a Magistrate Judge for all purposes. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
8 8 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 02/27 10:30 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Darwin Boggs, upon Defendant Island Auto Parts Warehouse, Inc. served on 2/26/2025, answer due 3/19/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon ABDUL GHANIEZADEH, AS AGENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
7 7 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 02/26 1:42 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Darwin Boggs, upon Defendant Transtar Properties, LLC served on 2/25/2025, answer due 3/18/2025. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
6 6 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 02/05 9:29 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Island Auto Parts Warehouse, Inc., Transtar Properties, LLC. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Notice of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent CV-20B optional html form Wed 02/05 9:28 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (et)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
4 4 notice Summons Request Tue 02/04 3:31 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Darwin Boggs. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 02/04 3:31 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 02/04 3:30 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Darwin Boggs. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 02/04 3:30 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39041465 - Fee: $405. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Darwin Boggs(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]