North Carolina Western District Court
Judge:Kenneth D Bell
Referred: Susan C Rodriguez
Case #: 3:25-cv-00086
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
CauseDiversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Feb 04, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 22, 2025 6:40 AM EDT
Defendant
Tess Farnan
Represented By
Marc Edward Gustafson
Bell Davis & Pitt, PA
contact info
Defendant
Mark Schatteman
Represented By
Marc Edward Gustafson
Bell Davis & Pitt, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
XPO, Inc.
Represented By
Douglas M. Jarrell
Robinson, Bradshaw And Hinson
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, March 24, 2025
7 7 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 03/24 4:14 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by XPO, Inc. (All Claims Dismissed. Case to be Closed). (Jarrell, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Change of Address Fri 02/14 2:28 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Douglas M. Jarrell (Jarrell, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
5 5 motion Extension of Time Tue 02/11 11:05 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Tess Farnan, Mark Schatteman. (Gustafson, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 02/11 11:10 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' answer due by 2/25/2025. So Ordered. Entered by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 2/11/2025. (DLG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 02/06 9:47 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by XPO, Inc.. (Jarrell, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
3 3 misc Citizenship Disclosure Statement Wed 02/05 10:30 AM
Disclosure Statement of Citizenship of Party or Intervenor by Mark Schatteman. (Gustafson, Marc)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Citizenship Disclosure Statement Wed 02/05 10:29 AM
Disclosure Statement of Citizenship of Party or Intervenor by Tess Farnan. (Gustafson, Marc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 02/05 8:03 AM
Case assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell and US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the[LINK:Case Assignment Packet] . This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (llp)
Related: [-]
utility Judge Bell Civil Standing Order Requiring ISC Wed 02/05 8:03 AM
Clerk's Entry and Service of[LINK:Standing Order Requiring an Initial Settlement Conference in Civil Cases] assigned to the Honorable Kenneth D. Bell (5:19-mc-5 (Doc. No. 1)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. The filing party is directed to serve a copy of the Order with service. (llp)
Related: [-]
utility Standing Order Regarding Use of Artificial Intelligence Wed 02/05 8:04 AM
Standing Order Regarding Use of Artificial Intelligence (3:24-mc-104). Click on this link to retrieve the Standing Order (llp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 02/04 5:19 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Mecklenburg County Superior Court, case number 25-CVS-2356-590. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCWDC-6832656), filed by Mark Schatteman, Tess Farnan.(Gustafson, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1- Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2- Notice of Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3- Affidavit of Douglas M. Jarrell,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4- Affidavit of Service for Mark Schatteman,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5- Affidavit of Service for Tess Farnan,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6- Unfiled Notice to State Court of Removal to Federal Court