Wisconsin Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:G Michael Halfenger
Case #: 2:25-bk-20576
Case Filed:Feb 04, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$500,001 to $1 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Cytophil, Inc., Debtor
2485 Corporate Cir Ste 2
East Troy, WI 53120-2577
Represented By
Evan Schmit
Kerkman & Dunn
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U. S. Trustee
517 East Wisconsin Ave. Room 430
Milwaukee, WI 53202


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 12:03 PM CDT
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
91 91 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report Wed 05/14 1:46 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: April 30, 2025 filed by Evan Schmit on behalf of Cytophil, Inc.. (Schmit, Evan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
court BNC Return Mail Fri 05/16 3:48 AM
BNC Returned Mail for Zavation, Inc., c/o Current Officer, 400 Liberty Park, Drive Flowood, MS 39232 ( RE:85 Amended Order ). (Admin)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
90 90 motion Compensation/Monthly Invoices Mon 05/12 3:12 PM
Final Application for Compensation Final Application for Allowance of Fees and Costs by Subchapter V Trustee for Iana A Vladimirova, Trustee Chapter 11, Fee: $8910, Expenses: $0. with Notice of Motion and Certificate of Service filed by Attorney Iana A Vladimirova. Objections due by 6/2/2025. (Vladimirova, Iana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Friday, May 09, 2025
89 89 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 05/09 11:43 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+]. Notice Date 05/09/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 88 Order (Generic)
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
88 88 1 pgs order Order (Generic) Wed 05/07 2:36 PM
Order Discharging the SubChapter V Trustee. (jam, Deputy Clerk) (Signed: 05/07/2025)
Related: [-]