Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:25-mj-08433
Case Filed:Feb 03, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 05, 2025 12:22 AM MST
Defendant
Nicholas Roosevelt Ward (1)
Defendant
Vincent D. Ward, Jr. (2)
Represented By
Efthymios Stefanos Katsarelis
Katsarelis Law PLLC
contact info
Material Witness
Material Witnesses
Represented By
Ricardo Bours
Law Office Of Ricardo Bours
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Austin L Fenwick
Us Attorneys Office - Tucson, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/05/2025 1:47 AM MST
Saturday, February 01, 2025
Arrest of Nicholas Roosevelt Ward, Vincent D. Ward, Jr on 2/1/2025. (CMB)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Nicholas Roosevelt Ward, Vincent D. Ward, Jr. (CMB)
Related: [-]
2 2 AFFIDAVIT FOR DETENTION OF MATERIAL WITNESS by USA as to Nicholas Roosevelt Ward, Vincent D. Ward, Jr signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A Ambri. (CMB)
Related: [-]
3 3 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A Ambri: Initial Appearance for Material Witness in case as to Nicholas Roosevelt Ward, Vincent D. Ward, Jr held on 2/3/2025. Material Witness(es) are present and in custody. Ricardo Bours appointed as counsel for the material witnesses with appointment type CJA. The Court orders the Material Witnesses temporarily detained in the custody of the United States Marshal pursuant to 18§3144. IT IS ORDERED the United States Attorney shall schedule a date and time for the video deposition of the material witness(es) within 30 days of appearance. (a juvenile material witness within 24 hours) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel shall preserve video deposition testimony pending resolution of this matter. The Court notes the Video Deposition is currently scheduled for Friday, February 28, 2025, at 8:30 AM. Material Witness(es) present and state true name to be the following: Kevin Yair Rodriguez-Ramirez, Yulisa Montalvo-Lopez, and Dolores Yosseli Medina-Sotelo. Appearances : AUSA Rui Wang (duty) for the Government, CJA Attorney Ricardo Bours for material witness(es). Material Witness(es) are present and in custody. Spanish Interpreter Arturo Garcia, appears telephonically, and assists material witness(es). Related [+] Hearing held 1:39 PM to 1:56 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SGG)
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
4 4 Notice of Video Deposition Hearing as to Nicholas Roosevelt Ward, Vincent D. Ward, Jr. (SGG)
Related: [-]
5 5 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A Ambri: Initial Appearance as to Vincent D. Ward, Jr held on 2/3/2025. FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT TAKEN. Appointing Efthymios Stefanos Katsarelis for Vincent D. Ward, Jr with Appointment Type: CJA. Defendant(s) state true name to be the same. Detention Hearing as to Vincent D. Ward, Jr held on 2/3/2025. Defendant ordered/continued released on own recognizance. Defendant is advised on the record. Preliminary Hearing as to Vincent D. Ward, Jr waived on 2/3/2025. Finding: Defendant held to answer before District Court. Interpreter required for Vincent D. Ward Jr. (2) English. Material Witness Video Depositions are set for 2/28/2025 at 8:30 AM. In the presence of government and defense counsel, the Court orally advises the government of their Brady obligation. Written order to follow. Appearances : AUSA Rui Wang (duty) for the Government, CJA Attorney Efthymios Katsarelis for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Related [+] Hearing held 3:07 PM to 5:24 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SGG)
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
6 6 ORDER: Under federal law, including Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and all applicable decisions from the Supreme Court and the Ninth Circuit interpreting Brady , the government has a continuing obligation to produce all information or evidence known to the government relating to guilt or punishment that might reasonably be considered favorable to the defendant's case, even if the evidence is not admissible so long as it is reasonably likely to lead to admissible evidence. See United States v. Price , 566 F.3d 900,913 n.14 (9th Cir. 2009). Accordingly, the court orders the government to produce to the defendant in a timely manner all such information or evidence. Information or evidence may be favorable to a defendant's case if it either may help bolster the defendant's case or impeach a prosecutor's witness or other government evidence. If doubt exists, it should be resolved in favor of the defendant with full disclosure being made. If the government believes that a required disclosure would compromise witness safety, victim rights, national security, a sensitive law-enforcement technique, or any other substantial government interest, the government may apply to the Court for a modification of the requirements of this Disclosure Order, which may include in camera review and/or withholding or subjecting to a protective order all or part of the information. This Disclosure Order is entered under Rule 5(f) and does not relieve any party in this matter of any other discovery obligation. The consequences for violating either this Disclosure Order or the government's obligations under Brady include, but are not limited to, the following: contempt, sanction, referral to a disciplinary authority, adverse jury instruction, exclusion of evidence, and dismissal of charges. Nothing in this Disclosure Order enlarges or diminishes the government's obligation to disclose information and evidence to a defendant under Brady , as interpreted and applied under Supreme Court and Ninth Circuit precedent. As the Supreme Court noted, "the government violates the Constitution's Due Process Clause 'if it withholds evidence that is favorable to the defense and material to the defendant's guilt or punishment." ' Turner v. United States , 137 S. Ct. 1885, 1888 (2017), quoting Smith v. Cain , 565 U.S. 73, 75 (2012). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A Ambri.(SGG)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.)
Related: [-]
7 7 SEALED CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Vincent D. Ward, Jr. (SGG)
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Vincent D. Ward, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A Ambri on 2/03/2025. (SGG)
Related: [-]