California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:25-mj-00474
Case Filed:Feb 03, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 04, 2025 11:25 PM PST
Defendant
Abel Gonzalez Olivera (1)
Represented By
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Lynette M. Belsky
Federal Defenders Of San Diego, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Evangeline Athena Dech
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/05/2025 12:52 AM PST
Sunday, February 02, 2025
Arrest of Abel Gonzalez Olivera (no document attached) (fjp)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Abel Gonzalez Olivera.(fjp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Abel Gonzalez Olivera: Initial Appearance set for 2/3/2025 before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. (no document attached) (fjp)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Evangeline Athena Dech appearing for USA. (Dech, Evangeline)Attorney Evangeline Athena Dech added to party USA(pty:pla) (axi).
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard: Initial Appearance as to Abel Gonzalez Olivera held on 2/3/2025. Appointed Attorney Federal Defenders for Abel Gonzalez Olivera. Bond set as to Abel Gonzalez Olivera (1) $10,000 PS secured by 1 FRA. Rule 5 advisement provided. ( Preliminary Hearing set for 2/13/25 at 9:30am before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Arraignment set for 2/27/25 at 9:30am before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. ) (Interpreter Cynthia Herber). (CD# 2/3/2025 AHG 25-1:2:31-2:53;3:12-3:20). (Plaintiff Attorney Stephen Simpson AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Jeremy Dang FD-S/A). (aje)
Related: [-]
5 5 ***Spanish Interpreter needed as to Abel Gonzalez Olivera (no document attached) (aje)
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Abel Gonzalez Olivera (1) $10,000 PS secured by 1 FRA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 2/3/2025. (yem)
Related: [-]
9 9 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Abel Gonzalez Olivera (yem)
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER as to Abel Gonzalez Olivera: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 2/3/25. (aje)
Related: [-]