California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:25-mj-00492
Case Filed:Feb 03, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 04, 2025 11:32 PM PST
Defendant
Nitisha Nicole Coleman (1)
Represented By
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Lynette M. Belsky
Federal Defenders Of San Diego, Inc.
contact info
Material Witness
Yun Chen
Represented By
Ray Antonio Estolano
Estolano Law
contact info
Material Witness
Li Zhong
Represented By
Ray Antonio Estolano
Estolano Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Allison Rogge
Doj-Usao
contact info
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/05/2025 1:05 AM PST
Sunday, February 02, 2025
Arrest of Nitisha Nicole Coleman (no document attached) (gac)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Nitisha Nicole Coleman.(gac)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Minute Order. Material Witness Attorney Ray Antonio Estolano appointed for Li Zhong and Yun Chen. Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Nitisha Nicole Coleman: Initial Appearance set for 2/3/2025 before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. (no document attached) (fjp)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Allison Rogge appearing for USA. (Rogge, Allison)Attorney Allison Rogge added to party USA(pty:pla) (axi).
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard: Initial Appearance as to Nitisha Nicole Coleman held on 2/3/2025. Appointed Attorney Federal Defenders for Nitisha Nicole Coleman. Bond set as to Nitisha Nicole Coleman (1) $15,000 PS secured by 2 FRAs or 1 FRA and $1500 cash deposit. Rule 5 advisement provided. ( Preliminary Hearing set for 2/13/25 at 9:30am before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Arraignment set for 2/27/25 at 9:30am before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. ) The Court confirms the appointment of MW attorney Ray Estolano(n/a). (CD# 2/3/2025 AHG 25-1:4:37-4:53). (Plaintiff Attorney Stephen Simpson AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Jeremy Dang FD-S/A). (aje)
Related: [-]
6 6 ***English. No Interpreter needed as to Nitisha Nicole Coleman (no document attached) (aje)
Related: [-]
9 9 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Nitisha Nicole Coleman (yem)
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Nitisha Nicole Coleman (1) $15,000 PS secured by 2 FRAs or 1 FRA Related [+] and $1500 cash deposit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 2/3/2025. (yem)
Related: [-] lated
11 11 ORDER as to Nitisha Nicole Coleman: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 2/3/25. (aje)
Related: [-]