Original Case: 2:20-cv-04116

Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cv-01205
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Case Filed:Feb 03, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 05, 2025 2:16 AM CST
Defendant - Appellee
Ahern Rentals, Inc.
Represented By
Jean-Paul Hendricks
MAIER GUTIERREZ & ASSOCIATES
contact info
Michael Lawrence Matula
OGLETREE & DEAKINS
contact info
Walter M. Brown
WALTER BROWN LAW FIRM
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Cory Rosencranse
Represented By
Charles Rosebrough
SHOOK & HARDY
contact info
Mark Christopher Tatum
SHOOK & HARDY
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
EquipmentShare.com, Inc.
Represented By
Jackson R. Hobbs
LATHROP GPM LLP
contact info
Michael E. Brewer
BAKER & MCKENZIE
contact info
Rosalee M. McNamara
LATHROP GPM LLP
contact info
Mark D. Taylor
BAKER & MCKENZIE
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/05/2025 2:16 AM CST
Monday, February 03, 2025
5 pgs Civil case docketed. [5481461] 25-1205 (RDB)
Related: [-]
30+ pgs Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order dated 1/2/2025, Judgment dated 1/2/2025 [5481462] 25-1205 (RDB)
Related: [-]
2 pgs BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS:
Appendix due on 03/17/2025. BRIEF OF APPELLANT EquipmentShare.com, Inc. due 03/17/2025.
Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant.
[5481463] 25-1205 (RDB)
Related: [-]