District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Beryl A Howell
Case #: 1:25-cv-00334
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Feb 05, 2025
Terminated:Mar 06, 2025
Case in other court:USCA, 25-05057
Last checked: Saturday Mar 22, 2025 6:22 AM EDT
Amicus
STATE OF HAWAII
Amicus
STATE OF WISCONSIN
Amicus
STATE OF VERMONT
Amicus
STATE OF TENNESSEE
Represented By
Whitney D. Hermandorfer
Office Of Tennessee Attorney General
contact info
Amicus
STATE OF RHODE ISLAND
Amicus
STATE OF OREGON
Amicus
STATE OF NEW YORK
Amicus
STATE OF NEW MEXICO
Amicus
STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Amicus
STATE OF NEVADA
Amicus
STATE OF MINNESOTA
Represented By
Zach Biesanz
Minnesota Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Amicus
STATE OF MICHIGAN
Amicus
STATE OF MARYLAND
Amicus
STATE OF ILLINOIS
Amicus
STATE OF FLORIDA
Florida Office of the Attorney General PL-01, The Capitol
Tallahassee, FL 32399
Represented By
Darrick Monson
Florida Attorney Generals Office
contact info
Nathan Andrew Forrester
Office Of The Attorney General/fl
contact info
David Costello
Florida Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Jeffrey Paul DeSousa, I
Office Of The Attorney General/fl
contact info
Amicus
STATE OF DELAWARE
Amicus
STATE OF CONNECTICUT
Amicus
STATE OF COLORADO
Amicus
STATE OF CALIFORNIA
Office of the Attorney General 1300 I Street
Sacramento, CA 95814
Amicus
STATE OF ARIZONA
Amicus
DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
400 6th Street NW 10th Floor
Washington, DC 20001
Amicus
CONSTITUTIONAL ACCOUNTABILITY CENTER
1200 18th Street NW, Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036
Represented By
Brianne Jenna Gorod
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS
Defendant
CONSTITUTIONAL ACCOUNTABILITY CENTER
1200 18th Street NW, Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036
Defendant
DONALD J. TRUMP
Represented By
Madeline McMahon
Doj-Civ
contact info
Alexander William Resar
Doj-Civ
contact info
Harry Graver
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
MARVIN KAPLAN
Represented By
Madeline McMahon
Doj-Civ
contact info
Alexander William Resar
Doj-Civ
contact info
Harry Graver
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
GWYNNE A. WILCOX
Represented By
Gregory A. Beck
Gupta Wessler LLP
contact info
Deepak Gupta
Gupta Wessler LLP
contact info
Jennifer Bennett
Gupta Wessler LLP
contact info
Matthew Wessler
Gupta Wessler LLP
contact info

GPO Mar 06 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding plaintiff's 10 Motion for Summary Judgment and defendants' 23 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 6, 2025. (lcbah4)

Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Saturday, March 08, 2025
41 41 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Sat 03/08 11:12 AM
ORDER DENYING defendants'39 Motion for Stay. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 8, 2025. (lcbah4)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
40 40 respm Response to motion Fri 03/07 6:43 PM
RESPONSE re39 MOTION to Stay Court's Order Pending Appeal filed by GWYNNE A. WILCOX. (Gupta, Deepak)
Related: [-]
39 39 motion Stay Fri 03/07 6:12 PM
MOTION to Stay Court's Order Pending Appeal by DONALD J. TRUMP, MARVIN KAPLAN. Related [+]
Related: [-] sar, Alexander
38 38 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Fri 03/07 8:56 AM
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals docketing fee was not paid because the appeal was filed by the government re36 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (znmw)
Related: [-]
appeal USCA Case Number Fri 03/07 9:36 AM
USCA Case Number 25-5057 for36 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by MARVIN KAPLAN, DONALD J. TRUMP. (mg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
37 37 misc Transcript Thu 03/06 7:13 PM
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS, before Judge Beryl A. Howell, held on 3 05-2025 Page Numbers: 1 - 101. Date of Issuance: 3 06-2025 Court Reporter: Elizabeth Davila, Telephone number: 202-354-3242. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the[LINK:Transcript Order Form] For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 3/27/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/6/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/4/2025.(Davila, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
36 36 appeal Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Thu 03/06 6:01 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to35 Memorandum & Opinion,34 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, by DONALD J. TRUMP, MARVIN KAPLAN. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. Related [+]
Related: [-] sar, Alexander
35 35 36 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Thu 03/06 3:29 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding plaintiff's10 Motion for Summary Judgment and defendants'23 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 6, 2025. (lcbah4)
Related: [-]
34 34 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Thu 03/06 3:25 PM
ORDER GRANTING plaintiff's10 Motion for Summary Judgment and DENYING defendants'23 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 6, 2025. (lcbah4)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
minutes Motion Hearing Wed 03/05 12:24 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beryl A. Howell: Motion Hearing held on 3/5/2025 re10 Motion for Summary Judgment/Expedite and23 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court Heard Oral Arguments From The Parties. (Court Reporter ELIZABETH DAVILA.) (mac)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
33 33 notice Notice of Supplemental Authority Tue 03/04 7:26 PM
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by GWYNNE A. WILCOX(Gupta, Deepak)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Harris v. Bessent,
Att: 2 Exhibit Dellinger v. Bessent
Sunday, March 02, 2025
32 32 notice Notice of Substitution of Counsel Sun 03/02 12:08 PM
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Alexander William Resar on behalf of DONALD J. TRUMP, MARVIN KAPLAN Substituting for attorney Madeline M. McMahon Related [+]
Related: [-] sar, Alexander
Friday, February 28, 2025
31 31 misc Amicus Brief Fri 02/28 5:47 PM
AMICUS BRIEF by STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF ARIZONA, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF COLORADO, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF DELAWARE, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF HAWAII, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF MARYLAND, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF NEVADA, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF OREGON, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF VERMONT, STATE OF WISCONSIN. (Biesanz, Zach)
Related: [-]
30 30 respm Reply to opposition to motion Fri 02/28 2:12 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re23 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by DONALD J. TRUMP, MARVIN KAPLAN. (McMahon, Madeline)
Related: [-]
29 29 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/28 11:20 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Harry Graver on behalf of DONALD J. TRUMP, MARVIN KAPLAN (Graver, Harry)
Related: [-]
notice Notice (Other) Fri 02/28 9:32 AM
NOTICE: Members of the public or media who wish to listen to live audio of the hearing scheduled for March 5, 2025 at 10AM ET, without physically attending the proceeding, may do so by dialing the Toll Free Number: 833-990-9400, Meeting ID: 491822013. Any use of the public access telephone line requires adherence to the general prohibition against photographing, recording, livestreaming, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings (including those held by telephone or videoconference), as set out in Standing Order No. 24-31 (JEB), available here:[LINK:] Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. (mac)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
notice Notice of Hearing Thu 02/27 10:31 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: The Parties Shall Appear For A Motion Hearing scheduled for March 5, 2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26A- In Person before Judge Beryl A. Howell. (mac)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
28 28 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Tue 02/25 4:59 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DONALD J. TRUMP served on 2/25/2025(Gupta, Deepak)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Donald J. Trump Certified Mail Receipt
27 27 13 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Tue 02/25 4:46 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re10 Motion for Summary Judgment, Motion to Expedite,23 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by GWYNNE A. WILCOX. (Gupta, Deepak)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
26 26 28 pgs misc Amicus Brief Mon 02/24 12:08 PM
AMICUS BRIEF in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and in Support of Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by STATE OF FLORIDA. (Forrester, Nathan)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/24 11:52 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Bennett on behalf of GWYNNE A. WILCOX (Bennett, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of QC **DO NOT USE- FOR REPORTING PURPOSES ONLY.** Mon 02/24 4:13 PM
NOTICE OF ERROR re26 Amicus Brief; emailed to nathan.forrester@myfloridalegal.com, cc'd 38 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please note the following for future filings; do not refile document , 2. Signature on Filing must match PACER account (mg, )
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
24 24 respm Response to motion Fri 02/21 5:14 PM
RESPONSE re10 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION to Expedite ,23 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by STATE OF FLORIDA. (Forrester, Nathan)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Summary Judgment Fri 02/21 4:35 PM
Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by DONALD J. TRUMP, MARVIN KAPLAN.(McMahon, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Statement of Facts
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/21 4:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David Costello on behalf of STATE OF FLORIDA (Costello, David)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/21 4:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Paul DeSousa, I on behalf of STATE OF FLORIDA (DeSousa, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/21 4:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Darrick Monson on behalf of STATE OF FLORIDA (Monson, Darrick)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/21 4:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Andrew Forrester on behalf of STATE OF FLORIDA (Forrester, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
18 18 misc Amicus Brief Thu 02/20 2:17 PM
AMICUS BRIEF OF STATE OF TENNESSEE by Whitney Hermandorfer. (Hermandorfer, Whitney)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Thu 02/20 11:35 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 02/20/2025., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MARVIN KAPLAN served on 2/19/2025(Gupta, Deepak)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit United States Attorney General Certified Mail Receipt,
Att: 2 Affidavit Marvin E. Kaplan,
Att: 3 Exhibit Marvin E. Kaplan Certified Mail Receipt
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/20 5:56 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING plaintiff's16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Ms. Jennifer Bennett may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing the plaintiff in this action. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) [LINK:Click for instructions] . Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 20, 2025. (lcbah4)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
16 16 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 02/19 5:04 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jennifer D. Bennett, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11490360. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GWYNNE A. WILCOX.(Gupta, Deepak)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, February 14, 2025
15 15 misc Amicus Brief Tue 02/18 10:04 AM
AMICUS BRIEF by CONSTITUTIONAL ACCOUNTABILITY CENTER. (mg)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Leave to File Document Fri 02/14 2:45 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by CONSTITUTIONAL ACCOUNTABILITY CENTER.(Gorod, Brianne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Brief,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney Fri 02/14 11:44 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/11/2025. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/12/2025.(Gupta, Deepak)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Fri 02/14 4:25 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the Constitutional Accountability Center's14 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief to which all parties consent. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 14, 2025. (lcbah4)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
utility Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 02/12 1:45 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendants Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion For Expedited Summary Judgment And Any Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment due no later than 5:00PM on 2/21/2025.Plaintiff Reply In Support Of Motion And Any Opposition To Defendants' Cross Motion due no later than 5:00PM on 2/25/2025. Defendants Reply In Support Of Cross-Motion due no later than 5:00PM on 2/28/2025. Motion Hearing set for 3/5/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26A- In Person before Judge Beryl A. Howell. (mac)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
12 12 misc Proposed Briefing Schedule Tue 02/11 1:57 PM
PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE Joint by GWYNNE A. WILCOX. (Gupta, Deepak)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/11 1:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Madeline McMahon on behalf of All Defendants (McMahon, Madeline)
Related: [-]
order .Order Tue 02/11 3:27 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless), upon consideration of the parties'12 Proposed Briefing Schedule, ISSUING the following SCHEDULING ORDER: 1. By February 21, 2025 at 5:00 pm, defendants shall file any opposition to plaintiff's motion for expedited summary judgment and any cross-motion for summary judgment; 2. By February 25, 2025 at 5:00 pm, plaintiff shall file any reply in support of her motion and any opposition to defendants' cross motion; 3. By February 28, 2025 at 5:00 pm, defendants shall file any reply in support of their cross-motion; and 4. On March 5, 2025 at 10:00 AM any hearing, if necessary, will be held in-person in Courtroom 26A. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 11, 2025. (lcbah4)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
10 10 3 pgs motion Summary Judgment Expedite Mon 02/10 3:39 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment , MOTION to Expedite by GWYNNE A. WILCOX.(Gupta, Deepak)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement of Facts,
Att: 2 13 pgs Memorandum in Support,
Att: 3 Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/10 10:25 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory A. Beck on behalf of GWYNNE A. WILCOX (Beck, Gregory)
Related: [-]
order .Order Mon 02/10 4:00 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless), upon consideration of plaintiff's10 Motion for Expedited Summary Judgment, DIRECTING the parties to confer and jointly propose an expedited summary judgment briefing schedule by 2:00 pm on February 11, 2025. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 10, 2025. (lcbah4)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 02/10 4:13 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties Joint Proposed Expedited Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule due no later than 2:00PM on 2/11/2025. (mac)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/07 3:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Wessler on behalf of GWYNNE A. WILCOX (Wessler, Matthew)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/07 2:47 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jennifer D. Bennett, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11465758. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GWYNNE A. WILCOX.(Gupta, Deepak)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/07 3:48 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DENYING without prejudice plaintiff's7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Jennifer D. Bennett. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.2(e)(2), motions for pro hac admission must be accompanied by "a certificate of the court or bar for the state in which the applicant regularly practices, which has been issued within thirty (30) days of filing and states that the applicant is a member in good standing of the bar of that state court." Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 7, 2025. (lcbah4)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
6 6 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Thu 02/06 10:37 AM
SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (mg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
5 5 order .Order Wed 02/05 4:28 PM
STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 5, 2025. (lcbah4)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs cmp Request for Summons to Issue Wed 02/05 10:29 AM
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by GWYNNE A. WILCOX. Related document:1 Complaint filed by GWYNNE A. WILCOX.(Gupta, Deepak)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs cmp Request for Summons to Issue Wed 02/05 10:27 AM
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by GWYNNE A. WILCOX. Related document:1 Complaint filed by GWYNNE A. WILCOX.(Gupta, Deepak)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs service Electronic Summons Issued Wed 02/05 10:00 AM
SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to MARVIN KAPLAN, DONALD J. TRUMP.(zmtm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 02/05 9:21 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-11456936) filed by GWYNNE A. WILCOX.(Gupta, Deepak)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 02/05 9:58 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zmtm)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Error- New Case Wed 02/05 10:01 AM
NOTICE OF NEW CASE ERROR The following error(s) need correction: Missing summonses- U.S. government. When naming a U.S. government agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply a summons for each defendant & two additional summonses for the U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue. (zmtm)
Related: [-]