267
|
|
267
2
pgs
order
Order (PDF)
Wed 05/07 2:30 PM
Stipulation and Agreed Order Extending Time for the United States Trustee to Respond to the Application to Employ Plante & Moran, PLLC, as Tax Accountant and Auditor Signed on 5/7/2025 Related [+]. The deadline for the United States Trustee only to object or otherwise respond to the Motion is extended through and including May 14, 2025. (dzeme crt)
|
266
|
|
266
court
Certificate of Service
Tue 05/06 6:22 PM
Certificate of Service of Alain B. Francoeur Regarding Notice of Amendment to Affected Parties Filed by Other Prof. Kroll Restructuring Administration, LLC Related [+]. (Baer, Herbert cr)
|
265
|
|
265
notice
Notice (PDF)
Tue 05/06 10:39 AM
Notice OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR CREDITOR LAKE BUSINESS PRODUCTS, INC. Filed by Creditor Lake Business Products. (Eppler, Douglas aty)
Related: [-]
|
264
|
|
264
court
Certificate of Service
Mon 05/05 10:42 AM
Certificate of Service of Engels Medina Regarding Stipulation Extending Time for the Bellevue Hospital to Submit Its Monthly Operating Report for March 2025 Filed by Other Prof. Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC Related [+]. (Baer, Herbert cr)
|
263
|
|
263
BNC
Notice of Application for Compensation
Mon 05/05 12:11 AM
Notice of Application for Compensation w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 05/04/2025. (Admin.)
|
262
|
|
262
court
Certificate of Service
Fri 05/02 6:17 PM
Certificate of Service of Eladio Perez Regarding Application to Employ and Retain Plante & Moran, PLLC, as Tax Accountant and Auditor Filed by Other Prof. Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC Related [+]. (Baer, Herbert cr)
|
261
|
|
261
court
Court's Notice
Fri 05/02 1:39 PM
Court's Notice Related [+] (dzeme)
|
260
|
|
260
BNC
Notice of Order (PDF)
Fri 05/02 12:12 AM
Notice of Order (PDF) w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 05/01/2025. (Admin.)
|
259
|
|
259
court
Certificate of Service
Thu 05/01 9:47 PM
Certificate of Service of Reese Campanalonga Regarding Confirmation Order Filed by Other Prof. Kroll Restructuring Administration, LLC Related [+]. (Baer, Herbert cr)
|
258
|
|
258
notice
Notice (PDF)
Wed 04/30 4:16 PM
Notice of Filing First and Final Fee Application of Juniper Advisory, LLC, for Allowance of Compensation as Investment Banker for Debtor (doc 257) Filed by Debtor The Bellevue Hospital. (Stovall, Richard aty)
Related: [-]
|
257
|
|
257
motion
Compensation
Wed 04/30 4:12 PM
First Application for Compensation of Juniper Advisory, LLC, for Allowance of Compensation as Investment Banker for Debtor for Juniper Advisory, LLC, Other Professional, Fee: $500000, Expenses: $4461.95. Filed by Attorney Richard K. Stovall (Stovall, Richard aty) Modified on 4/30/2025 to allow for the correct applicant for compensation as Juniper Advisory, LLC to replace original Richard Stovall (dzeme)
Related: [-]
|