Colorado District Court
Judge:Richard T Gurley
Case #: 1:25-cv-00378
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:621 Job Discrimination
Case Filed:Feb 04, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 22, 2025 4:07 AM MDT
Defendant
David Fa
Defendant
SRS-AOT-American Roofing Supply
Defendant
Tracy Spence
Defendant
Luis Gonzalez
Plaintiff
Miguel A Vazquez
4986 Worchester Street
Denver, CO 80239


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
8 8 order Minute Order Wed 04/23 8:58 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley on 4/22/2025. In response to the Court's February 7, 2025 Order Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies and Amend Complaint (ECF No.4 ), on March 14, 2025, Plaintiff filed an amended Complaint (ECF No.7 ). However, since Plaintiff did not file an Amended Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form), he has not cured all the filing deficiencies. Thus, Plaintiff shall have up to and including May 22, 2025 , to cure the deficiencies and file a complete and legible Amended Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) as previously directed in the Courts February 7, 2025 Order (ECF No.4 ). Plaintiff is reminded that the action will be dismissed without further notice if he fails to cure all of the deficiencies as ordered within the time allowed. No further extensions will be granted absent a showing of just cause. (ccuen, )
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
7 7 cmp Complaint Mon 03/17 8:49 AM
COMPLAINT against David Fa, Luis Gonzalez, SRS-AOT-American Roofing Supply, Tracy Spence, filed by Miguel A Vazquez.(ccuen, )
Related: [-]
6 6 order Minute Order Mon 03/17 8:30 AM
MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion for Time (ECF No.5 ) is granted as follows. Plaintiff shall have up to and including April 15, 2025, to cure the deficiencies and file an Amended Complaint as previously directed in the Courts February 7, 2025 Order (ECF No.4 ). Plaintiff is reminded that the action will be dismissed without further notice if he fails to cure all of the deficiencies and submit an Amended Complaint as ordered within the time allowed. No further extensions will be granted absent a showing of just cause. By Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley on 3/14/2025. (ccuen, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
5 5 motion Extension of Time Tue 03/04 8:31 AM
MOTION for/to Time by Plaintiff Miguel A Vazquez. (echa, )
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
4 4 6 pgs order Order Fri 02/07 4:32 PM
ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES AND AMEND COMPLAINT. That within thirty days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall file an Amended Employment Discrimination Complaint form and an Amended Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) that complies with the directives in this order and cures the designated deficiencies. Any papers that Plaintiff files in response to this order must include the civil action number on this order. The initial Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) (ECF No.2 ) is denied without prejudice as both incomplete and illegible. By Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley on 2/7/2025. (ccuen, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
3 3 misc Case Assigned to Judge Wed 02/05 9:05 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley. Text Only Entry. (echa, )
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 02/05 9:02 AM
Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Miguel A Vazquez. (echa, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 02/05 9:01 AM
EMPLOYMENT DISCRIMINATION COMPLAINT against David Fa, Luis Gonsoles, SRS-AOT-American Roofing Supply, Tracy Spence, filed by Miguel A Vazquez.(echa, )
Related: [-]