New Jersey District Court
Judge:William J Martini
Referred: Jessica S Allen
Case #: 2:25-cv-01017
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Feb 05, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 22, 2025 11:45 AM EDT
Defendant
NAGOMI ENTERPRISE, LLC
Plaintiff
WISLANDE CLAUDE
Represented By
RAMI SALIM
Stein Saks PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, March 03, 2025
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 03/03 12:45 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by WISLANDE CLAUDE. NAGOMI ENTERPRISE, LLC served on 2/27/2025, answer due 3/20/2025. (SALIM, RAMI)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 02/18 3:55 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to NAGOMI ENTERPRISE, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (adc, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
1 1 19 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 02/05 12:33 PM
COMPLAINT against NAGOMI ENTERPRISE, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15997742) with JURY DEMAND, filed by WISLANDE CLAUDE.(SALIM, RAMI)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 02/05 10:56 PM
Case Assigned to Judge William J. Martini and Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. (mfr)
Related: [-]