Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Nitza I Quinones Alejandr
Case #: 2:25-cv-00629
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332(d)(5)(B) Diversity of Citizenship under CAFA
Case Filed:Feb 05, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 22, 2025 6:44 AM EDT
Defendant
ALLY BANK
Represented By
NICOLE W. FRIEDLANDER
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
contact info
JOHN S. STAPLETON
Stapleton Segal Cochran LLC
contact info
MATTHEW A. SCHWARTZ
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
contact info
Defendant
ALLY FINANCIAL INC.
Represented By
NICOLE W. FRIEDLANDER
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
contact info
JOHN S. STAPLETON
Stapleton Segal Cochran LLC
contact info
MATTHEW A. SCHWARTZ
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
contact info
Defendant
FINANCIAL BUSINESS AND CONSUMER SOLUTIONS, INC.
Plaintiff
ROBERT HAMILTON
Represented By
ANDREW FERICH
Ahdoot & Wolfson, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, April 11, 2025
20 20 notice Notice (Other) Fri 04/11 4:03 PM
NOTICE by ALLY BANK, ALLY FINANCIAL INC. OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE(STAPLETON, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, March 20, 2025
19 19 2 pgs order Order Fri 03/21 9:21 AM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STAY IS GRANTED. ACCORDINGLY ALL DEADLINES IN THIS CASE AND THE RELATED CASES ARE STAYED UNTIL THIS COURT RULES ON THE POTENTIAL CONSOLIDATION ISSUE OUTLINED IN THIS COURT'S ORDER DATED 2/27/25. THE CERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO FILE THIS ORDER IN ALL RELATED CASES. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 3/20/25.3/21/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 03/20 3:45 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER, THE TIME FOR ALLY TO MOVE AGAINST, ANSWER, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED UNTIL APRIL 17, 2025. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 3/20/2025. 3/20/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
17 17 misc Stipulation Wed 03/19 4:33 PM
STIPULATION STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING EXTENSION by ALLY BANK, ALLY FINANCIAL INC.. (STAPLETON, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Fri 03/14 4:45 PM
NOTICE by ALLY BANK, ALLY FINANCIAL INC. OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STAY DEADLINES IN RELATED CASES(STAPLETON, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Thursday, February 27, 2025
15 15 2 pgs order Order Fri 02/28 11:10 AM
ORDER THAT A RULE IS HEREBY ISSUED FOR THE PARTIES TO ADDRESS A POTENTIAL CONSOLIDATION ISSUE NOTED IN THE STATUS REPORT. INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL AND PLAINTIFFS SHOULD PURSUE ACTIONS AGAINST FBCS AND FBCS CUSTOMERS IN SEPARATE ACTION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 2/27/25. 2/27/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (mbh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Wed 02/26 4:24 PM
ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE OF NICOLE FRIEDLANDER IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 2/26/2025.2/26/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Wed 02/26 4:20 PM
ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE OF MATTHEW A. SCHWARTZ IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 2/26/2025.2/26/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 02/26 3:30 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME FOR ALLY TO MOVE AGAINST, ANSWER, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED UNTIL 3/27/2025. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 2/24/2025. 2/26/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
11 11 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Wed 02/26 12:10 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by ALLY BANK.(STAPLETON, JOHN)
Related: [-]
10 10 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Wed 02/26 12:09 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by ALLY FINANCIAL INC..(STAPLETON, JOHN)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Stipulation Wed 02/26 12:07 PM
STIPULATION & Proposed Order for Extension of Time by ALLY BANK, ALLY FINANCIAL INC.. (STAPLETON, JOHN)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Wed 02/26 12:04 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Nicole W. Friedlander ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-18100490.) filed by ALLY BANK, ALLY FINANCIAL INC...(STAPLETON, JOHN)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Wed 02/26 12:01 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Matthew A. Schwartz ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-18100431.) filed by ALLY BANK, ALLY FINANCIAL INC...(STAPLETON, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 02/25 1:32 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ROBERT HAMILTON. FINANCIAL BUSINESS AND CONSUMER SOLUTIONS, INC. waiver sent on 2/7/2025, answer due 4/8/2025. (FERICH, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
5 5 misc Notice Re: Magistrate Consent Thu 02/20 8:57 AM
Opt In Notice of Procedure to Consent to Random Magistrate Judge Assignment(nd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Consent Form
Friday, February 07, 2025
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 02/07 1:07 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ROBERT HAMILTON re: Jordan Jacobson served Summons and Complaint upon ALLY BANK. ALLY BANK served on 2/6/2025, answer due 2/27/2025. (FERICH, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 02/07 12:20 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ROBERT HAMILTON re: Gilbert Del Valle served Summons and Complaint upon ALLY FINANCIAL INC.. ALLY FINANCIAL INC. served on 2/6/2025, answer due 2/27/2025. (FERICH, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 02/05 2:36 PM
Summons Issued as to ALLY BANK, ALLY FINANCIAL INC., FINANCIAL BUSINESS AND CONSUMER SOLUTIONS, INC.. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL on 2/5/2025 (sg)
Related: [-]
1 1 44 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney) Wed 02/05 12:32 PM
COMPLAINT (CLASS ACTION) against ALLY BANK, ALLY FINANCIAL INC., FINANCIAL BUSINESS AND CONSUMER SOLUTIONS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-18054544.), filed by ROBERT HAMILTON.(FERICH, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet (Civil Cover Sheet),
Att: 2 Designation Form (Designation Form)