California Central District Court
Judge:John W Holcomb
Referred: Douglas F Mccormick
Case #: 8:25-cv-00215
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Feb 05, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 22, 2025 3:43 AM PDT
Amicus
United States of America
Department of Justice 150 M. Street NE
Washington, DC 20001
Represented By
Noah David Sacks
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Amy Xu
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
City of Santa Ana
Represented By
Sandra M. Flores
Santa Ana City Attorneys Office
contact info
Laura A Rossini
Santa Ana City Attorneys Office
contact info
Defendant
Santa Ana City Council
Represented By
Sandra M. Flores
Santa Ana City Attorneys Office
contact info
Laura A Rossini
Santa Ana City Attorneys Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Anchor Stone Christian Church
Represented By
Grant E Gibson
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Timothy S Durst
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Ryan N Gardner
First Liberty Institute
contact info
Joshua Jilovec
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Mason W Malpass
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Nora N Salem
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Jace Breedlove
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Jeremiah G Dys
First Liberty Institute
contact info
Sarah K Nelson
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
74 74 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 1) (Judge) (ADR-12) Tue 04/15 1:00 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 1 by Judge John W. Holcomb. Case ordered to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick for Settlement Conference. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 10/24/2025. (cla)
Related: [-]
73 73 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/15 12:52 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. This case is set for trial before the Honorable John W. Holcomb in Courtroom 9D, Ronald Reagan Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 411 W. 4th Street, Santa Ana, California. The Jury Trial is set for 2/2/2026 at 9:00 AM.The final pretrial conference is set for 1/16/2026 at 1:00 p.m. The Discovery cut-off is 9/26/2025. The last date to conduct settlement conference is 10/24/2025. Judge Holcomb hears motions in civil cases, through in-person appearances, on Fridays at 9:00 a.m. The cut-off date for hearing motions is the last day on which motions will be heard, i.e., the motion must be filed at least 28 days before the deadline in accordance with the requirements of L.R. 6-1. Counsel are encouraged to review the Central District's website for additional information: www.cacd.uscourts.gov. The Courtroom Deputy Clerk is DIRECTED to serve a copy of this Order personally, electronically, or by mail on counsel for all parties to this action. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See document for further details) (yl)
Related: [-]
72 72 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Tue 04/15 12:31 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE OFF CALENDAR by Judge John W. Holcomb: The Court has considered the parties' Joint Rule 16(b)/26(f) Report with respect to the Scheduling Conference and has concluded that the hearing on April 18, 2025, is not necessary. Accordingly, the Scheduling Conference is taken off calendar. No appearance by counsel is necessary. A separate order will issue setting the deadlines and dates for this case. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cla)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
71 71 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Mon 04/14 10:44 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Melissa Mabel Crosthwaite counsel for Defendants City of Santa Ana, Santa Ana City Council. Adding Melissa Crosthwaite as counsel of record for Cityof Santa Ana, Santa Ana City Council for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants City of Santa Ana, Santa Ana City Council. (Attorney Melissa Mabel Crosthwaite added to party City of Santa Ana(pty:dft), Attorney Melissa Mabel Crosthwaite added to party Santa Ana City Council(pty:dft))(Crosthwaite, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
70 70 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Fri 04/11 6:13 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3-5 days, filed by Plaintiff Anchor Stone Christian Church.. (Durst, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
69 69 textonly Notice of Filing Transcript Tue 04/08 4:41 PM
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 3-28-25 9:05 a.m. re Transcript68 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Seffens, Sharon)
Related: [-]
68 68 transcript -Transcript Tue 04/08 4:40 PM
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 3-28-25 9:05 a.m. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Sharon A Seffens, phone number sseffens@earthlink.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/29/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/9/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2025. (Seffens, Sharon)
Related: [-]