Mississippi Northern District Court
Judge:Glen H Davidson
Referred: Roy Percy
Case #: 1:25-cv-00018
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Feb 05, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 22, 2025 6:29 AM CDT
Defendant
Bauhaus Furniture Group, LLC
Represented By
Keith C. Kantack
Kantack Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenny H. Shell
Represented By
Richard Shane McLaughlin
Mclaughlin Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
19 19 notice Notice of Service Thu 05/08 2:07 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents, Electronically Stored Data and/or Tangible Things Propounded to Plaintiff by Keith C. Kantack on behalf of Bauhaus Furniture Group, LLC to Plaintiff, Kenny H. Shell, by and through his attorney. (Kantack, Keith)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
18 18 notice Notice of Service Thu 05/01 10:10 AM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Discovery Requests by Richard Shane McLaughlin on behalf of Kenny H. Shell to Defendant. (McLaughlin, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
17 17 2 pgs order Order Wed 04/09 3:02 PM
ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 4/9/25. (rtc)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Conference Wed 04/09 2:29 PM
NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/14/2026 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Trial Wed 04/09 11:41 AM
NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 6/15/2026 09:30 AM in Aberdeen Courtroom 2 before Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson. (tlr)
Related: [-]
14 14 4 pgs order Order Wed 04/09 11:27 AM
ORDER regarding settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 4/9/25. (rtc)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Case Management Order Wed 04/09 11:26 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/14/2026 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Discovery due by 10/9/2025. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 5/9/2025. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 7/9/2025. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 8/11/2025. Motions due by 10/30/2025. Settlement Conference set for 9/23/2025 02:00 PM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 4/9/25. (rtc)
Related: [-]
12 12 minutes Case Management Conference Wed 04/09 11:24 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Case Management Conference held on 4/9/2025. (rtc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of Service Thu 04/03 3:57 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Disclosures by Keith C. Kantack on behalf of Bauhaus Furniture Group, LLC to Kenny H. Shell. (Kantack, Keith)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Service Wed 04/02 10:16 AM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Richard Shane McLaughlin on behalf of Kenny H. Shell to Defendant Bauhaus Furniture Group, LLC. (McLaughlin, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 03/18 3:44 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint Defendant, Bauhaus Furniture Group, LLC's Answer and Affirmative Defenses by Bauhaus Furniture Group, LLC. (Kantack, Keith)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
8 8 order Initial Order - Rule 16.1 Fri 02/28 10:40 AM
INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 4/9/2025 11:00 AM in Oxford Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 2/28/25. (rtc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 02/27 3:18 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Bauhaus Furniture Group, LLC's answer due 3/19/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 2/27/25. (rrh)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 02/24 2:08 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Bauhaus Furniture Group, LLC. (Kantack, Keith)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 02/24 2:00 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Keith C. Kantack on behalf of Bauhaus Furniture Group, LLC (Kantack, Keith)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 02/06 3:58 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Shane McLaughlin on behalf of Kenny H. Shell Bauhaus Furniture Group, LLC served on 2/6/2025. (McLaughlin, Richard)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Thu 02/06 9:05 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Sharion Aycock recused. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 2/6/2025. (zdg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 02/05 12:04 PM
Summons Issued as to Bauhaus Furniture Group, LLC. Counsel is instructed to download and print for service. (tab)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 02/05 12:02 PM
COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMSNDC-2489792, filed by Kenny H. Shell. (tab)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Charge of Discrimination,
Att: 2 Exhibit B Dismissal and Notice of Rights,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
notice Notice of Assignment Wed 02/05 12:06 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Sharion Aycock and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (tab)
Related: [-]