Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Rodney Gilstrap
Case #: 2:25-cv-00136
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Feb 05, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 22, 2025 4:46 AM CDT
Counter Claimant
Republic Title of Texas, Inc.
Represented By
Neil J McNabnay
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Lance Eric Wyatt, Jr
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Counter Defendant
Torus Ventures LLC
Represented By
Isaac Phillip Rabicoff
Rabicoff Law LLC
contact info
Defendant
Republic Title of Texas, Inc.
Represented By
Neil J McNabnay
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Lance Eric Wyatt, Jr
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Plaintiff
Torus Ventures LLC
Represented By
Isaac Phillip Rabicoff
Rabicoff Law LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, April 14, 2025
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 04/14 5:09 PM
ORDER denying as moot7 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/14/2025. (gsm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
14 14 answer Answer to Counterclaim Wed 04/02 5:06 PM
ANSWER to8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Torus Ventures LLC.(Rabicoff, Isaac)
Related: [-]
13 13 4 pgs order Order Wed 04/02 3:02 PM
CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues with the LEAD CASE, Case No. 2:25-cv-00102. All parties are instructed to file any future filings in the LEAD CASE. Individual cases remain active for trial. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/2/2025. (NKL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 03/25 11:09 AM
ORDER granting11 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to7 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Responses due by 4/9/2025. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/25/2025. (NKL)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 23, 2025
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Sun 03/23 4:35 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to7 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by Torus Ventures LLC.(Rabicoff, Isaac)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, March 21, 2025
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Fri 03/21 3:58 PM
JOINT NOTICE Joint Position Statement Regarding § 101 Claim Construction by Republic Title of Texas, Inc. re7 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim (Wyatt, Lance)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
9 9 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Wed 03/12 11:27 AM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Republic Title of Texas, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate First American Financial Corporation for Republic Title of Texas, Inc., Republic Title of Texas, Inc.. (Wyatt, Lance)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Wed 03/12 11:25 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Torus Ventures LLC by Republic Title of Texas, Inc..(Wyatt, Lance)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Dismiss Wed 03/12 11:24 AM
MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by Republic Title of Texas, Inc..(Wyatt, Lance)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 03/12 11:20 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Neil J McNabnay on behalf of Republic Title of Texas, Inc. (McNabnay, Neil)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Wed 03/12 1:41 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (NKL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 02/05 3:42 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Republic Title of Texas, Inc.. (NKL)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Wed 02/05 3:35 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Wed 02/05 3:34 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Torus Ventures LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 02/05 3:32 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isaac Phillip Rabicoff on behalf of Torus Ventures LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 02/05 3:30 PM
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Republic Title of Texas, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10660799.), filed by Torus Ventures LLC.(Rabicoff, Isaac)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 02/05 3:34 PM
Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (NKL)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Wed 02/05 3:35 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (NKL)
Related: [-]