Kentucky Eastern District Court
Judge:David L Bunning
Referred: Edward B Atkins
Case #: 0:25-cv-00016
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Feb 05, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 22, 2025 6:27 AM EDT
Defendant
Prosecutor Nikki Burke
Defendant
Deputy Landon Duvall
Represented By
Casmir Michael Thornberry
Adams Law, PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey C. Mando
Adams Law, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Judge Scott T. Reese
Defendant
Deputy Chase Steele
Represented By
Casmir Michael Thornberry
Adams Law, PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey C. Mando
Adams Law, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Adrian Meeks
3810 Shopes Creek Road
Catlettsburg, KY 41129


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 04/23 12:16 PM
ORDER: Pla's11 Motion Join Indispensable Party is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins on 4/23/25. (JLS)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
17 17 respoth Response Mon 04/21 2:49 PM
RESPONSE to Order to Clarify12 filed by Adrian Meeks, pro se. (JLS)
Related: [-]
utility File Submitted Mon 04/21 2:50 PM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Atkins for review:17 RESPONSE (JLS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
16 16 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 04/15 2:06 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Scott T. Reese(Zimmerer, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, April 14, 2025
15 15 service Summons Returned Tue 04/15 11:36 AM
Summons Returned Executed by Adrian Meeks as to Nikki Burke served on 3/24/2025, answer due 4/14/2025; Landon Duvall served on 3/26/2025, answer due 4/16/2025; Scott T. Reese served on 3/25/2025, answer due 4/15/2025; Chase Steele served on 3/26/2025, answer due 4/16/2025. (JLS)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
14 14 motion Dismiss Fri 04/11 4:49 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Nikki Burke, Landon Duvall, Chase Steele(Blesi, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order granting MTD
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/11 4:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Madeline Samantha Blesi on behalf of Nikki Burke, Landon Duvall, Chase Steele (Blesi, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
12 12 1 pgs order Order Wed 04/09 11:34 AM
ORDER : Meeks is DIRECTED to clarify the purpose of his11 MOTION To Join Indespendable Party NOT 4/23/25. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins on 4/9/25.(JLS)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
11 11 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 04/07 3:32 PM
MOTION To Join Indespendable Party by Adrian Meeks, pro se.Motions referred to Edward B. Atkins. (JLS)
Related: [-]
10 10 respoth Response Mon 04/07 3:29 PM
RESPONSE to9 , filed as "Rebuttal to the Answer of Defendants, Chase Steele and Landon Duval filed by Adrian Meeks, pro se. (JLS)
Related: [-]
utility Motion Submitted Mon 04/07 3:33 PM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Atkins for review: re11 MOTION To Join Indespendable Party by Adrian Meeks, pro se. (JLS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 03/19 2:09 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Landon Duvall, Chase Steele.(Mando, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
8 8 notice Other Notice Mon 03/03 3:43 PM
NOTICE, certified mail notices by Adrian Meeks, pro se. (JLS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
7 7 2 pgs order Order Wed 02/12 5:05 PM
STANDING REFERRAL ORDER : 1) This matter be referred to US Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings. 2) the Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved as set out herein.. Signed by Chief District Judge David L Bunning on 8/15/22.(JLS)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 02/12 5:02 PM
ORDER : 1) Meeks shall serve the defts with a summons and copy of the complaint w/i 90 days after the filing of the complaint; 2) this matter is REFERRED to a US Magistrate Judge for further proceedings, including ensuring that Pla has complied with Rule 4; preparing proposed findings of fact and recommendations on dispositive motions; 3) the Clerk shall assign a US Magistrte Judge and notify the Court when the 90 days had passed from filing the complaint and when any submissions in the case. Signed by Chief District Judge David L Bunning on 2/12/25.(JLS)
Related: [-]
utility File Submitted Wed 02/12 5:09 PM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Atkins for review:5 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge and 6 Case Assignment. (JLS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
4 4 order Standing Order re: Disclosure of Contact Information Wed 02/05 5:03 PM
STANDING ORDER re: Disclosure of Contact Information: 1. pro se litigants must provide current telephone number, residential address, & if different, mailing address. 2. pro se litigants must provide written notice of change of residential address, & if different, mailing address. 3. Clerk file copy of Order in all non-prisoner pro se actions. Failure to provide required information or change of address may result in appropriate sanctions. . Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 2/5/25.(KSS)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Pro Se Information Packet Wed 02/05 4:59 PM
IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court.[LINK:Click here for more information on the rules.] It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail(KSS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Sample Caption
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 02/05 4:53 PM
COMPLAINT (Filing fee $405; receipt number 950), filed by Adrian Meeks, pro se.(KSS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement in Support,
Att: 2 Receipt
misc Conflict Check Wed 02/05 4:56 PM
Conflict Check run. (KSS)
Related: [-]
utility File Submitted Wed 02/05 5:05 PM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review:1 Complaint (KSS)
Related: [-]