California Central District Court
Judge:Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpo
Referred: Patricia Donahue
Case #: 2:25-cv-01010
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal -- Other Contract
Case Filed:Feb 05, 2025
Case in other court:Los Angeles County Superior Court, 24STCV34670
Last checked: Saturday Mar 22, 2025 3:49 AM PDT
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
Represented By
Soheyl Tahsildoost
Theta Law Firm LLP
contact info
Mehgan Gallagher
Theta Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Grant Richard Nafso
Represented By
Alastair F Hamblin
California Consumer Attorneys PC
contact info
Sepehr Daghighian
California Consumer Attorneys PC
contact info
Michael H Rosenstein
California Consumer Attorneys PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
15 15 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Thu 04/24 5:26 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3-4 Days, filed by Plaintiff Grant Richard Nafso.. (Hamblin, Alastair)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
14 14 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Tue 03/04 2:16 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. Scheduling Conference set for 5/8/2025 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (dbe)
Related: [-]
13 13 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 03/04 2:13 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong: This matter has been assigned to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's website under Judge Frimpong's Procedures and Schedules. Please read the Standing Order carefully. It is the responsibilities of the parties to maintain familiarly with the Standing Order and any future amendments that the Court may issue by periodically checking the Court's website for the operative version of the Standing Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dbe)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Thu 02/20 10:50 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alastair F Hamblin counsel for Plaintiff Grant Richard Nafso. Adding Alastair F. Hamblin as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Grant Richard Nafso. (Hamblin, Alastair)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Thu 02/20 10:48 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sepehr Daghighian counsel for Plaintiff Grant Richard Nafso. Adding Sepehr Daghighian as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Grant Richard Nafso. (Daghighian, Sepehr)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 02/20 10:47 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Grant Richard Nafso, identifying Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company. (Rosenstein, Michael)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Thu 02/20 10:46 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael H Rosenstein counsel for Plaintiff Grant Richard Nafso. Adding Michael H. Rosenstein as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Grant Richard Nafso. (Rosenstein, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Thu 02/13 4:01 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick to Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:25-cv-01010 MEMF(PDx). (rn)
Related: [-]
7 7 textonly MJDAP Timely Opt-Out Thu 02/13 2:15 PM
Declination of Consent form received on 2/13/2025 was submitted within deadline set forth in L.R. 73-2.1. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vmun)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Wed 02/12 11:59 PM
ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC.(Tahsildoost, Soheyl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
5 5 misc Notice of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent CV-20B optional html form Thu 02/06 11:55 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (lh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
4 4 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 02/05 4:26 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA LLC. (Tahsildoost, Soheyl)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 02/05 4:25 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties (Tahsildoost, Soheyl)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 02/05 4:25 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA LLC (Tahsildoost, Soheyl)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 02/05 4:24 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 24STCV34670 Receipt No: ACACDC-39051450 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA LLC. (Attorney Soheyl Tahsildoost added to party Mercedes-Benz USA LLC(pty:dft))(Tahsildoost, Soheyl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Sales Contract
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Thu 02/06 11:59 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Grant Richard Nafso. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 12/31/2024 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ) (lh)
Related: [-]