Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Timothy J Corrigan
Referred: Samuel J Horovitz
Case #: 3:25-cv-00129
Nature of Suit210 Real Property - Land Condemnation
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Feb 05, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 22, 2025 11:27 AM EDT
Defendant
Onemain General Services Corporation
Represented By
West Allan Holden
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Sara Brown
Represented By
Tanner M. Borges
Richard Celler Legal, P.A.
contact info
Noah E. Storch
Richard Celler Legal, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 48 minutes ago
Thursday, February 13, 2025
9 9 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 02/13 9:53 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Sara Brown. (Borges, Tanner)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of a Related Action Thu 02/13 9:52 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Sara Brown. Related case(s): Yes (Borges, Tanner)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Thu 02/13 9:51 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Tanner M. Borges on behalf of Sara Brown. Lead Counsel: Tanner M. Borges. (Borges, Tanner)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 02/07 10:43 AM
NOTICE TO ALL COUNSELS of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AM)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 02/07 8:57 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TPL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
3 3 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 02/06 2:55 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Samuel J. Horovitz. New case number: 3:25-cv-129-TJC-SJH. (TNP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
6 6 cmp Complaint Fri 02/07 10:56 AM
COMPLAINT against Onemain General Services Corporation with Jury Demand filed by Sara Brown. Filed in State Court on 01/02/2025 (AM)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Compel Wed 02/05 6:05 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Compel Arbitration by ONEMAIN GENERAL SERVICES CORPORATION, a Foreign Profit Corporation.(Holden, West)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - EDR Program Arbitration Agreement
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 02/05 5:37 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court - St. Johns County, case number CA25-0006 filed in State Court on January 2, 2025. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-22990340 filed by ONEMAIN GENERAL SERVICES CORPORATION, a Foreign Profit Corporation.(Holden, West)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents,
Att: 2 State Court COMPLAINT,
Att: 3 State Court Docket Sheet,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet