Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:David A Ruiz
Case #: 5:25-cv-00225
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Feb 05, 2025
Terminated:Feb 20, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 22, 2025 6:40 AM EDT
Defendant
Changsha Guanxin Technology Co., Ltd
Plaintiff
Brainista, Inc.
Represented By
Jacob M. Busch
Busch Ip Law - Richfield
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, February 24, 2025
7 7 oth_doc Report Regarding Copyright Action - AO121 Mon 02/24 2:53 PM
Report on the Determination [Closing] of an Action Regarding a Copyright (AO121). (M,CE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order Dismissing Case
Thursday, February 20, 2025
6 6 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 02/20 3:48 PM
Marginal Entry Order of Case Dismissal pursuant to Plaintiff's5 Notice of Dismissal. Judge David A. Ruiz on 2/20/2025. (G,CA)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Dismissal Thu 02/20 8:37 AM
Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Brainista, Inc.. (Busch, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
4 4 2 pgs oth_evt Summons Issued Thu 02/06 9:18 AM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Changsha Guanxin Technology Co., Ltd. (B,DL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Magistrate Consent Form
utility Add and Terminate Judge Thu 02/06 9:11 AM
Judge David A. Ruiz assigned to case. (B,DL)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Thu 02/06 9:13 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Reuben J. Sheperd. (B,DL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
3 3 oth_doc Report Regarding Copyright Action - AO121 Wed 02/05 9:13 PM
Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright (AO121) filed by Brainista, Inc.. (Busch, Jacob)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Wed 02/05 9:11 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Brainista, Inc.. (Busch, Jacob)
Related: [-]
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 02/05 9:06 PM
Complaint with jury demand Copyright Infringement Claim against Changsha Guanxin Technology Co., Ltd. Filing fee paid $ 405, Receipt number AOHNDC-12944692.. Filed by Brainista, Inc.. (Busch, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Declaration of Jacob Busch,
Att: 4 Exhibit 1 - Counter Notice,
Att: 5 Exhibit 2 - Derivative Work on Product,
Att: 6 Exhibit 3 - Derivative Work on Website,
Att: 7 Exhibit 4 - First IP Complaint,
Att: 8 Exhibit 5 - Second IP Complaint