USA v. Imperial-Carrizosa
Arizona District Court | |
Case #: | 2:25-cr-00156 |
Case Filed: | Feb 04, 2025 |
Last checked: Thursday Feb 06, 2025 12:16 AM MST |
Defendant
Ramon Eduardo Imperial-Carrizosa (1)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 02/06/2025 1:06 AM MST |
Tuesday, December 31, 2024 | ||
Arrest of Ramon Eduardo Imperial-Carrizosa on 12/31/2024. (JMA) [2:25-mj-01000-JFM] | ||
Thursday, January 02, 2025 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Friday, January 03, 2025 | ||
2 | 2 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf: Initial Appearance as to Ramon Eduardo Imperial-Carrizosa held on 1/3/2025. Appointing George Jacob Romero for the defendant with Appointment Type: FPD. Defendant(s) state true name to be the same. Detention Hearing as to the defendant submitted on 1/3/2025. Defendant ordered/continued detained pending trial. Preliminary Hearing as to the defendant waived on 1/3/2025. Finding: Defendant held to answer before District Court. Interpreter required for the defendant (1) Spanish. As required by Rule 5(f), the United States is ordered to produce all information required by Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, and contempt proceedings. Appearances : AUSA William George (Duty) for the Government, AFPD George Jacob Romero for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Spanish Interpreter Miguel Aguayo assists defendant. Hearing held 11:27 AM to 11:30 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SYV) [2:25-mj-01000-JFM] | |
3 | 3 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, the United States is ordered to disclose in a timely manner all exculpatory evidence to the defendant(s), that is, all evidence that is favorable to the defendant(s) or tends to cast doubt on the United States' case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Failure to comply with this order may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, the reversal of any conviction, the exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, and/or sanctions by the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf.(SYV)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) [2:25-mj-01000-JFM] | |
4 | 4 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Ramon Eduardo Imperial-Carrizosa. I conclude that the following facts require the detention of the defendant pending trial in this case. Findings of Fact and Statement of Reasons: (1) There is probable cause to believe that the defendant has committed an offense. (2) There is a serious risk that the defendant will not appear. (3) Defendant is a citizen of another country, illegally in the United States of America. (4) Defendant does not have sufficient ties to the community. (5) The reports from Pretrial Services Agency are adopted as the further findings of this Magistrate Judge. Conclusions of Law: (1) There is a serious risk that the defendant will flee. (2) No condition or combination of conditions will reasonably assure the appearance of the defendant as required. Directions Regarding Detention: The defendant is committed to the custody of the Attorney General or his/her designated representative for confinement in a corrections facility separate, to the extent practicable, from persons awaiting or serving sentences or being held in custody pending appeal. The defendant shall be afforded a reasonable opportunity for private consultation with defense counsel. On order of a court of the United States or on request of an attorney for the Government, the person in charge of the corrections facility shall deliver the defendant to the United States Marshal for the purpose of an appearance in connection with a court proceeding. IT IS ORDERED that should an appeal of this detention order be filed with the District Court, it is counsel's responsibility to deliver a copy of the motion for review/reconsideration to Pretrial Services at least one day prior to the hearing set before the District Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if a release to a third party is to be considered, it is counsel's responsibility to notify Pretrial Services sufficiently in advance of the hearing before the District Court to allow Pretrial Services an opportunity to interview and investigate the potential third party custodian. Signed by Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf on 1/03/2025. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SYV) [2:25-mj-01000-JFM] | |
Monday, January 13, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
![]() |
|
Tuesday, January 14, 2025 | ||
7 | 7
![]() |
|
Tuesday, February 04, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() |
|
9 | 9
![]() |
|
10 | 10
![]() |
|
11 | 11
![]() |
|
12 | 12
![]() |
|
13 | 13 The parties having contacted the court, IT IS ORDERED, as to Ramon Eduardo Imperial-Carrizosa, Change of Plea Hearing set for 2/5/2025 at 11:00 AM in U.S. District Court of Arizona, 98 West 1st Street, Yuma, AZ 85364 before Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf.(JMA)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) |