Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 5:25-cr-00192
Case Filed:Feb 04, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Feb 06, 2025 1:28 AM CST
Defendant
Maria Eulalia Francisco-Baltazar (1)
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - Laredo
contact info
Sara A Martinez
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info
Ann Francis Booth
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/06/2025 2:26 AM CST
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
1 1 Proposed COMPLAINT as to Maria Eulalia Francisco-Baltazar (1), filed (Webb). Initial Appearance set for 1/22/2025 at 02:05 PM before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga (av5) [5:25-mj-00159]
Related: [-]
2 2 Statement in Support of Probable Cause by USA as to Maria Eulalia Francisco-Baltazar, filed. (av5) [5:25-mj-00159]
Related: [-]
3 3 FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ON STATEMENT on January 21, 2025 at 04:18 PM as to Maria Eulalia Francisco-Baltazar. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga) Parties notified. (av5) [5:25-mj-00159]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
Attorney update in case as to Maria Eulalia Francisco-Baltazar. Attorney Federal Public Defender - Laredo for Maria Eulalia Francisco-Baltazar added. (dlg5) [5:25-mj-00159]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. INITIAL APPEARANCE on Complaint as to Maria Eulalia Francisco-Baltazar held on 1/22/2025. Defendant advised of charge(s) and rights. Defendant requests appointed counsel. Financial Affidavit executed. Order appointing Federal Public Defender. Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing. No bond set. Court issued oral order regarding prosecutorial obligations under Rule 5(f) and Rule 12.4. All parties appeared in person. Defendant sworn in. Defendant provided written waiver for the Preliminary Examination and Detention Hearing to the court. Termination of applicable hearing to follow Appearances: Tae Chon AUSA; FPD Raul Guerra (on duty); USPTO: Antonia B. Garcia; USM: Deputy Villareal. (Opened/Adjourned: 3:05 PM - 3:17 PM) (ERO: Emmanuel Garcia) (Interpreter: Raul Gonzalez, used) Defendant remanded to custody. Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing set for 1/29/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. (dlg5) [5:25-mj-00159]
Related: [-]
4 4 COMPLAINT accepted by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga as to Maria Eulalia Francisco-Baltazar, filed. Agent: Luis Molina Castro (dlg5) [5:25-mj-00159]
Related: [-]
5 5 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Maria Eulalia Francisco-Baltazar, filed. (akp5). [5:25-mj-00159]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga) Parties notified. (dlg5) [5:25-mj-00159]
Related: [-]
7 7 BRADY AND FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE ORDER on Rule 5(f) and Rule 12.4 as to Maria Eulalia Francisco-Baltazar. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga) Parties notified. (dlg5) [5:25-mj-00159]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE OF SETTING as to Maria Eulalia Francisco-Baltazar. Preliminary Examination Hearing set for 1/29/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. (dlg5) [5:25-mj-00159]
Related: [-]
9 9 Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing as to Maria Eulalia Francisco-Baltazar. Detention Hearing set for 1/29/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga) Parties notified. (dlg5) [5:25-mj-00159]
Related: [-]
10 10 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Maria Eulalia Francisco-Baltazar, filed. (akp5) [5:25-mj-00159]
Related: [-]
11 11 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Defendant Maria Eulalia Francisco-Baltazar in the case of Maria Eulalia Francisco-Baltazar, filed. (akp5) [5:25-mj-00159]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
**Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Maria Eulalia Francisco-Baltazar: Prelim Exam and Detention Hrg terminated. (dlg5) [5:25-mj-00159]
Related: [-]
12 12 Order of Detention Pending Trial as to Maria Eulalia Francisco-Baltazar. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga) Parties notified. (dlg5) [5:25-mj-00159]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Ann Francis Booth appearing for USA, filed. (Booth, Ann) [5:25-mj-00159]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Sara A Martinez, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Maria Eulalia Francisco-Baltazar, filed. (Martinez, Sara) [5:25-mj-00159]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
13 13 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Maria Eulalia Francisco-Baltazar (1) count(s) 1, filed. (tat5)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
14 14 SCHEDULING ORDER as to Maria Eulalia Francisco-Baltazar. Arraignment set for 2/13/2025 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 2/24/2025. Expedited Plea Date: 3/27/2025. Change of Plea Notification due by 3/24/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/2/2025 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. (Signed by Judge Diana Saldana) Parties notified. (tat5)
Related: [-]