Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 5:25-cr-00232
Case Filed:Feb 04, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Feb 06, 2025 1:38 AM CST
Defendant
Jesus Retana Varela (1)
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - Laredo
contact info
John Samuel Paul
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info
Melissa Andrea Lopez
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/06/2025 2:43 AM CST
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
1 1 Proposed COMPLAINT as to Jesus Retana Varela (1), filed (Webb). Initial Appearance set for 1/16/2025 at 09:35 AM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos (dlg5) [5:25-mj-00096]
Related: [-]
2 2 Statement in Support of Probable Cause by USA as to Jesus Retana Varela, filed. (dlg5) [5:25-mj-00096]
Related: [-]
3 3 FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ON STATEMENT on January 15, 2025 at 09:26 AM as to Jesus Retana Varela. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (dlg5) [5:25-mj-00096]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Melissa Andrea Lopez appearing for USA, filed. (Lopez, Melissa) [5:25-mj-00096]
Related: [-]
Attorney update in case as to Jesus Retana Varela. Attorney Federal Public Defender - Laredo for Jesus Retana Varela added. (mlr5) [5:25-mj-00096]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos. INITIAL APPEARANCE on Complaint as to Jesus Retana Varela held on 1/16/2025. Defendant advised of charge(s) and rights. Defendant requests appointed counsel. Financial Affidavit executed. Order appointing Federal Public Defender. Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing. No bond set. Court issued oral order regarding prosecutorial obligations under Rule 5(f) and Rule 12.4. All parties appeared in person. Defendant sworn in. Defendant submitted written waiver of Preliminary Examination and Detention Hearing to the Court. Termination of applicable hearings to follow accordingly. Appearances: Leslie Cortez AUSA; FPD John S. Paul (on duty); USPTO: Ana Cordova-Rodriguez; USM: Deputy Martinez. (Opened/Adjourned: 9:40 AM - 10:05 AM) (ERO: Emmanuel Garcia) (Interpreter: Janis Palma, used) Defendant remanded to custody. Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing set for 1/22/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. (mlr5) [5:25-mj-00096]
Related: [-]
**Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Jesus Retana Varela: Prelim Exam and Detention Hrg terminated. (mlr5) [5:25-mj-00096]
Related: [-]
4 4 COMPLAINT accepted by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos as to Jesus Retana Varela, filed. Agent: Adrian Davila (mlr5) [5:25-mj-00096]
Related: [-]
5 5 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Jesus Retana Varela, filed. (tat5). [5:25-mj-00096]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:25-mj-00096]
Related: [-]
7 7 BRADY AND FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE ORDER on Rule 5(f) and Rule 12.4 as to Jesus Retana Varela. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:25-mj-00096]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE OF SETTING as to Jesus Retana Varela. Preliminary Examination Hearing set for 1/22/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. (mlr5) [5:25-mj-00096]
Related: [-]
9 9 Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing as to Jesus Retana Varela. Detention Hearing set for 1/22/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:25-mj-00096]
Related: [-]
10 10 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Jesus Retana Varela, filed. (tat5) [5:25-mj-00096]
Related: [-]
11 11 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Defendant Jesus Retana Varela,, filed. (tat5) [5:25-mj-00096]
Related: [-]
12 12 Order of Detention Pending Trial as to Jesus Retana Varela. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:25-mj-00096]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE John Samuel Paul, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Jesus Retana Varela, filed. (Paul, John) [5:25-mj-00096]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
13 13 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Jesus Retana Varela (1) count(s) 1, filed. (scg5)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
14 14 SCHEDULING ORDER as to Jesus Retana Varela. Arraignment set for 2/13/2025 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 2/24/2025. Expedited Plea Date: 3/27/2025. Change of Plea Notification due by 3/24/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/2/2025 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. (Signed by Judge John A Kazen) Parties notified. (scg5)
Related: [-]