Maine District Court
Case #: 2:25-mj-00011
Case Filed:Jan 07, 2025
Terminated:Jan 14, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Feb 06, 2025 2:23 AM EST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
SHIRA FURMAN
Doj-Usao
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
373 MEADE AVE ROOM 227B KITTERY, ET AL (1)
Terminated: 01/14/2025


Docket last updated: 02/06/2025 3:17 AM EST
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
1 1 Application and Affidavit for Search Warrant by USA as to 373 MEADE AVE ROOM 227B KITTERY, ET AL Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF.(lcb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Anthony Golt,
Att: 2 Attachment A: Property to be searched,
Att: 3 Attachment B: Description of Information to be Seized from Location Described in Attachment A
2 2 Search Warrant Issued in case as to 373 MEADE AVE ROOM 227B KITTERY, ET AL; Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. Search/Seizure/Tracking Warrant Return due by 2/6/2025.(lcb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment A: Property to be searched,
Att: 2 Attachment B: Description of Information to be Seized from Location Described in Attachment A