California Northern District Court
Judge:Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Case #: 4:25-cv-01259
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Feb 05, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 22, 2025 8:13 AM PDT
Defendant
Albertsons Safeway LLC
Plaintiff
Jennifer Schofield
Represented By
Dana J. Oliver, I
Oliver Law Center, Inc.
contact info
Dana J. Oliver
Oliver Law Center, Inc.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 04/02 12:07 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jennifer Schofield (Oliver, Dana)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
10 10 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Tue 03/11 9:41 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. You are hereby notified that the Initial Case Management Conference will be held by Zoom Webinar. Joint Case Management Statement is due by 4/21/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/28/2025, at 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at YGRCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than April 25, 2025, at 12:00 PM PST. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (eac, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 02/18 1:33 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See [LINK:General Order 65] and [LINK:cand.uscourts.gov/cameras] . Signed by The Clerk on 02/18/2025.(kxo, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Friday, February 14, 2025
8 8 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Fri 02/14 5:35 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Fri 02/14 2:31 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jennifer Schofield.. (Oliver, Dana)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
6 6 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Tue 02/11 11:34 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/30/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/7/2025 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 02/11 1:28 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jennifer Schofield. Service waived by Albertsons Safeway LLC waiver sent on 2/8/2025, answer due 4/9/2025. (Oliver, Dana)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 02/06 9:14 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/20/2025. (kam2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
3 3 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 02/05 7:01 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Jennifer Schofield (Oliver, Dana)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Wed 02/05 6:46 PM
Proposed Summons. (Oliver, Dana)
Related: [-]
1 1 19 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 02/05 6:40 PM
COMPLAINT against Albertsons Safeway LLC ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20318170.). Filed by Jennifer Schofield.(Oliver, Dana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet