Nebraska District Court
Case #: 4:25-cr-03008
Case Filed:Jan 23, 2025
Terminated:Jan 23, 2025
Last checked: Friday Feb 07, 2025 1:18 AM CST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Julie Ann Marie Mruz
Assistant United States Attorney - Lincoln
contact info
Matt E. Lierman
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Omaha
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Michael Dean Condon (1)
Terminated: 01/23/2025
Represented By
Toni M. Leija-Wilson
Federal Public Defender'S Office - Lincoln
contact info

GPO Feb 04 2025
ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL - This matter is before the court upon the filing of a petition alleging that the above-named defendant has violated condition(s) of supervision. The court has been informed that the defendant is in custody on state charges and finds that the defendant is eligible for appointment of counsel pursuant to the Criminal Justice Act, 18 U.S.C. §3006A, and Amended Criminal Justice Act Plan for the District of Nebraska. The Federal Public Defender for the District of Nebraska, 222 S 15th Street, Suite 300N, Omaha, NE 68102, (855) 690-9458, is appointed to represent the above-named defendant this matter. Upon acceptance of this appointment, the Federal Public Defender shall forthwith file an appearance in this matter as to defendant Michael Dean Condon. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (E-mailed to FPD)(NMW)
GPO Feb 11 2025
ORDER ON APPEARANCE FOR SUPERVISED RELEASE VIOLATION as to defendant Michael Dean Condon. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (NMW)
GPO Mar 31 2025
ORDER as to Michael Dean Condon. Defendant's motion to review the conditions of supervised release, (Filing No. 14), is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (E-mailed to USM) (LRM)

Docket last updated: 02/07/2025 2:40 AM CST
Thursday, January 23, 2025
1 1 TRANSFER OF JURISDICTION. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 49.1(a). ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD IN MULTI-DEFENDANT CASES MAY ACCESS THIS DOCUMENT as to Michael Dean Condon. Received certified copies of indictment, judgment and docket sheet from USDC-District of South Dakota, case number 3:21cr30057. Ordered by Judge Susan M. Bazis.(TCL) (TCL). Modified on 1/24/2025 to add sealed attachment (TCL).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (1/24/2025) Amended Judgment