Consolidated
Lead case: 2:23-md-03080

New Jersey District Court
Judge:Brian R Martinotti
Referred: Rukhsanah L Singh
Case #: 2:25-cv-01037
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Feb 06, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 23, 2025 6:19 AM EDT
Defendant
EVERNORTH HEALTH, INC.
Defendant
SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC
Defendant
OPTUMRX INC.
Defendant
OPTUMINSIGHT, INC.
Defendant
OPTUM, INC.
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
Defendant
MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC.
Defendant
EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC.
Defendant
EXPRESS SCRIPTS PHARMACY, INC.
Defendant
EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS, LLC
Defendant
ESI MAIL PHARMACY SERVICES, INC.
Defendant
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
Defendant
CVS PHARMACY, INC.
Defendant
CVS HEALTH CORPORATION
Defendant
CAREMARK, LLC
Defendant
CAREMARK RX, LLC
Defendant
CAREMARK PCS HEALTH, LLC
Defendant
UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC.
In Re
INSULIN PRICING LITIGATION
Plaintiff
PITTSYLVANIA COUNTY, VIRGINIA
Represented By
ROBERT KIRTLEY FINNELL
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Thursday, April 10, 2025
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 04/10 3:00 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PITTSYLVANIA COUNTY, VIRGINIA. CAREMARK PCS HEALTH, LLC waiver sent on 2/11/2025, answer due 4/14/2025; CAREMARK RX, LLC waiver sent on 2/11/2025, answer due 4/14/2025; CAREMARK, LLC waiver sent on 2/11/2025, answer due 4/14/2025; CVS HEALTH CORPORATION waiver sent on 2/11/2025, answer due 4/14/2025; CVS PHARMACY, INC. waiver sent on 2/11/2025, answer due 4/14/2025. (FINNELL, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 04/10 2:58 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PITTSYLVANIA COUNTY, VIRGINIA. UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC. waiver sent on 2/11/2025, answer due 4/14/2025. (FINNELL, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 04/10 2:57 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PITTSYLVANIA COUNTY, VIRGINIA. OPTUMRX INC. waiver sent on 2/11/2025, answer due 4/14/2025. (FINNELL, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 04/10 2:55 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PITTSYLVANIA COUNTY, VIRGINIA. OPTUM, INC. waiver sent on 2/11/2025, answer due 4/14/2025. (FINNELL, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 04/10 2:54 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PITTSYLVANIA COUNTY, VIRGINIA. OPTUMINSIGHT, INC. waiver sent on 2/11/2025, answer due 4/14/2025. (FINNELL, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 04/10 2:52 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PITTSYLVANIA COUNTY, VIRGINIA. ESI MAIL PHARMACY SERVICES, INC. waiver sent on 2/11/2025, answer due 4/14/2025; EVERNORTH HEALTH, INC. waiver sent on 2/11/2025, answer due 4/14/2025; EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS, LLC waiver sent on 2/11/2025, answer due 4/14/2025; EXPRESS SCRIPTS PHARMACY, INC. waiver sent on 2/11/2025, answer due 4/14/2025; EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC. waiver sent on 2/11/2025, answer due 4/14/2025; MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC. waiver sent on 2/11/2025, answer due 4/14/2025. (FINNELL, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 04/10 2:49 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PITTSYLVANIA COUNTY, VIRGINIA. NOVO NORDISK INC. waiver sent on 2/11/2025, answer due 4/14/2025. (FINNELL, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 04/10 2:47 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PITTSYLVANIA COUNTY, VIRGINIA. ELI LILLY AND COMPANY waiver sent on 2/11/2025, answer due 4/14/2025. (FINNELL, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 04/10 2:46 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PITTSYLVANIA COUNTY, VIRGINIA. SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC waiver sent on 2/11/2025, answer due 4/14/2025. (FINNELL, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 02/06 12:50 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to CAREMARK PCS HEALTH, LLC, CAREMARK RX, LLC, CAREMARK, LLC, CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, CVS PHARMACY, INC., ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, ESI MAIL PHARMACY SERVICES, INC., EVERNORTH HEALTH, INC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS, LLC, EXPRESS SCRIPTS PHARMACY, INC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC., MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC., NOVO NORDISK INC., OPTUM, INC., OPTUMINSIGHT, INC., OPTUMRX INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (krg, )
Related: [-]
1 1 263 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 02/06 9:34 AM
COMPLAINT against CAREMARK PCS HEALTH, LLC, CAREMARK RX, LLC, CAREMARK, LLC, CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, CVS PHARMACY, INC., ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, ESI MAIL PHARMACY SERVICES, INC., EVERNORTH HEALTH, INC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS, LLC, EXPRESS SCRIPTS PHARMACY, INC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC., MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC., NOVO NORDISK INC., OPTUM, INC., OPTUMINSIGHT, INC., OPTUMRX INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15999308) with JURY DEMAND, filed by PITTSYLVANIA COUNTY, VIRGINIA.(FINNELL, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
order Case Management Order Thu 02/06 12:50 PM
This case is part of MDL 3080. Parties are expected to review and abide by all prior orders entered in this MDL, which can be found[LINK:here] . (krg, )
Related: [-]
mdl MDL Direct File Thu 02/06 12:51 PM
Member Case Direct File on 2/6/2025, for MDL 3080 INSULIN PRICING LITIGATION. (krg, )
Related: [-]