Gibbs v. United States of America
North Carolina Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Richard E Myers, II |
Referred: | Robert B Jones, Jr |
Case #: | 7:25-cv-00290 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | Camp Lejeune Justice Act of 2022 |
Case Filed: | Feb 05, 2025 |
Last checked: Saturday Mar 22, 2025 12:00 PM EDT |
Defendant
United States of America
|
|
Interested Party
Torts Branch USDOJ
|
|
Plaintiff
Hal Alfred Gibbs, Jr.
302 Queen Anne's Rd
Greenville, NC 27858 |
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Thursday, February 13, 2025 | ||
notice
Notice of Pro Se E-Noticing
Thu 02/13 11:48 AM
Notice of Pro Se E-Noticing - Pro se party Hal Alfred Gibbs, Jr. has consented to receiving electronic service of all motions, notices, orders, and documents in civil cases in the Eastern District of North Carolina. All documents filed in CM-ECF will be served on this party via email pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 5.1. (Carter, Alexus) |
||
Thursday, February 06, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Order Redesignating Division to Southern Division. At the direction of the Court, and for the continued efficient administration of justice, the above-captioned case is redesignated as a Southern Division case. The Honorable Richard E. Myers II, Chief United States District Judge, will remain the presiding judge. All future filings should reflect the new case number of 7:25-CV-290-M. No further filing shall be made in 4:25-CV-27-M. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 2/5/2025. A copy of this order is mailed to Hal Alfred Gibbs, Jr., 302 Queen Anne's Rd, Greenville, NC 27858. (Carter, Alexus) |
|
transfer
Case Transferred In - Divisional Transfer
Thu 02/06 8:59 AM
Case transferred in from Eastern Division on 02/06/2025. Case Number 4:25-cv-27. (Carter, Alexus) |
||
service
Notice of Camp Lejeune Justice Act Case
Thu 02/06 9:05 AM
NOTICE OF SERVICE. This action is governed by Standing Order 23-SO-1. Pursuant to that Order, the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Filing using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing System, notifying the United States Attorney for the Eastern District of North Carolina and the Civil Division, Torts Branch, Environmental Torts Litigation Office, United States Department of Justice of the case. Plaintiff need not serve a summons and complaint under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. No summons will issue. Service of the Complaint and any attachments thereto will be completed by a regenerated Notice of Electronic Filing to follow immediately. (Carter, Alexus) |
||
notice
Notice to Counsel
Thu 02/06 10:16 AM
NOTICE - The Court has established a Plaintiffs' Leadership Group. The group and its Liaison Counsel are tasked with the responsibility to [k]eep pro se litigants apprised of the status and progress of the Litigation. The group has established a web site for this purpose:[LINK:www.camplejeunecourtinfo.com] The website can be used as a resource by all litigants. The Leadership Group is NOT acting as your attorney in your individual case. A copy of this notice is mailed to Hal Alfred Gibbs, Jr., 302 Queen Anne's Rd, Greenville, NC 27858. (Carter, Alexus) |
||
Wednesday, February 05, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Notice - Pursuant to Case Management Order No. 2 from the Master Docket, 7:23-cv-897, this case should have been filed in the Southern division. The Clerk will enter a reassignment order correcting the error. (Carter, Alexus) |