Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Melissa Damian
Case #: 9:25-cv-80170
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Feb 06, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
13 13 misc Reply to Response to Order to Show Cause Tue 05/13 11:55 AM
Petitioners Reply to10 Response to Order to Show Cause by Barry Michael Schultz. (pc)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/14 10:19 AM
NOTICE of Filing Transcripts by Florida Department of Corrections (Valuntas, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Transcripts Trial Transcript,
Att: 2 Transcripts Sentencing Transcript,
Att: 3 Transcripts New Sentencing Trancript,
Att: 4 Transcripts Evidentiary Hearing Transcript
11 11 misc Appendix Mon 04/14 10:13 AM
APPENDIX to10 Response to Order to Show Cause by Florida Department of Corrections(Valuntas, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Ex 1-13,
Att: 2 Appendix Ex 14-21
10 10 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Mon 04/14 10:09 AM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re8 Order to Show Cause, by Florida Department of Corrections. (Valuntas, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 03/21 12:11 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard Chambers Valuntas on behalf of Florida Department of Corrections. Attorney Richard Chambers Valuntas added to party Florida Department of Corrections(pty:dft). (Valuntas, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
8 8 5 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 03/17 10:34 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Barry Michael Schultz. Show Cause Response due by 4/16/2025. Signed by Judge Melissa Damian on 3/17/2025. See attached document for full details. (pc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Fri 03/14 10:44 AM
Notice of Filing Florida Department of Corrections Inmate Trust Fund Special Withdrawal by Barry Michael Schultz re1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (pc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
6 6 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Tue 02/11 10:10 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon pro se Petitioner's3 Motion for Leave to File Enlarged 2254 Petition. THE COURT has reviewed the Motion and pertinent portions of the record and is otherwise fully advised. Petitioner has already filed a seventy (70) page Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28. U.S.C. § 2254 wherein he raises only two claims. See ECF No.1 . In the instant Motion, Petitioner has failed to provide a valid reason to permit him to file an even longer petition. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the3 Motion for Leave to File Enlarged 2254 Petition is DENIED . Signed by Judge Melissa Damian on 2/11/2025. (cos)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
5 5 3 pgs order Order Requiring Payment of Filing Fee or Filing IFP Motion Mon 02/10 10:20 AM
ORDER REQUIRING FILING FEE OR MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS Filing Fee due by 3/6/2025. Motions due by 3/6/2025. Signed by Judge Melissa Damian on 2/10/2025. See attached document for full details. (pc)
Related: [-]
4 4 4 pgs order Order of Instructions to Pro Se Litigant Mon 02/10 10:17 AM
ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS Signed by Judge Melissa Damian on 2/10/2025. See attached document for full details. (pc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
3 3 motion File Excess Pages Thu 02/06 12:10 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Enlarged 2254 Petition with Memorandum of Law by Barry Michael Schultz. (kma)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Judge Assignment Thu 02/06 12:06 PM
Judge Assignment to Judge Melissa Damian (kma)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus Thu 02/06 12:01 PM
APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Filing fee $ 5.00 (not paid/IFP Motion not filed), filed by Barry Michael Schultz.(kma)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law