Louisiana Middle District Court
Judge:Scott D Johnson
Referred: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Case #: 3:25-cv-00110
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause15:2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Case Filed:Feb 06, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 23, 2025 4:40 AM CDT
Defendant
Toyota Motor North America, Inc.
Plaintiff
Mohammad S. Hamed
Represented By
Kevin Reeve Duck
Duck Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, February 13, 2025
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 02/13 4:16 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mohammad S. Hamed. Toyota Motor North America, Inc. served on 2/13/2025, answer due 3/6/2025. (Duck, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
4 4 notice Notice to Counsel - Initial Designation of Consent Case Mon 02/10 10:54 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: This case has been assigned to a United States Magistrate Judge for all purposes, including trial, final entry of judgment, and direct review by the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals. See General Order 2024-02 and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. Consent to a Magistrate Judge is voluntary. Any party may decline consent. Once all parties have appeared in this matter, a Consent Form will be noticed to the parties and a deadline set for the form to be returned to the court. The form will not be part of the court record and the identity of any party declining consent will not be communicated to any judge. (DCB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 02/06 10:07 AM
Summons Issued as to Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (EDC)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate of Interested Persons Thu 02/06 9:27 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Mohammad S. Hamed. (Duck, Kevin)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint (Complete Case Opening First) Thu 02/06 9:27 AM
COMPLAINT against Toyota Motor North America, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAMDC-2861046.), filed by Mohammad S. Hamed.(Duck, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons