California Central District Court
Judge:Monica Ramirez Almadani
Referred: Autumn D Spaeth
Case #: 2:25-cv-01026
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Feb 06, 2025
Terminated:Apr 02, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 23, 2025 3:13 AM PDT
Defendant
Direct Digital, LLC
Represented By
Allison C Nelson
Venable LLP
contact info
Ari N. Rothman
Venable LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Karestin Thompson
Represented By
Gerald Donald Lane, Jr.
Law Offices Of Jibrael S. Hindi
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
14 14 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Wed 04/02 2:57 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Karestin Thompson. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Lane, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Wed 03/12 5:25 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ari N. Rothman counsel for Defendant Direct Digital, LLC. Adding ALLISON C. NELSON as counsel of record for DEFENDANT DIRECT DIGITAL, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Direct Digital, LLC. (Rothman, Ari)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Wed 03/12 5:21 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ari N. Rothman counsel for Defendant Direct Digital, LLC. Adding ARI N. ROTHMAN as counsel of record for DEFENDANT DIRECT DIGITAL, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Direct Digital, LLC. (Rothman, Ari)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 03/12 5:15 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Direct Digital, LLC identifying WELLFUL, INC. as Corporate Parent. (Rothman, Ari)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 03/12 5:13 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Direct Digital, LLC, identifying WELLFUL, INC.. (Attorney Ari N. Rothman added to party Direct Digital, LLC (pty:dft))(Rothman, Ari)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Wed 02/19 5:50 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar to Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:25-cv-01026 MRA(ADSx). (rn)
Related: [-]
8 8 textonly MJDAP Timely Opt-Out Wed 02/19 4:19 PM
Declination of Consent form received on 2/19/25 was submitted within deadline set forth in L.R. 73-2.1. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jm)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 02/07 4:23 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Karestin Thompson. upon Direct Digital, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/6/2025, answer due 4/7/2025. Waiver of Service signed by Ari N. Rothman. (Lane, Gerald)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 02/07 11:37 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Direct Digital, LLC. (car)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Notice of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent CV-20B optional html form Fri 02/07 11:34 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (car)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
4 4 notice Summons Request Thu 02/06 10:13 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Karestin Thompson. (Lane, Gerald)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 02/06 10:09 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Karestin Thompson. (Lane, Gerald)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 02/06 10:06 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Karestin Thompson, (Lane, Gerald)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 02/06 10:03 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39054233 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Karestin Thompson. (Attorney Gerald Donald Lane, Jr added to party Karestin Thompson (pty:pla))(Lane, Gerald)
Related: [-]