Vermont District Court
Judge:Geoffrey W Crawford
Case #: 2:25-cv-00151
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Feb 06, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 23, 2025 5:56 AM EDT
Defendant
Ur Jaddou
Plaintiff
Alina Sunderji
1111B S Governors Ave., Ste 25136 STE 25136
Dover, DE 19904


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
4 4 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 04/29 2:27 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Kika Scott (Hazard, Kaitlin)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
3 3 motion Dismiss Mon 04/28 4:02 PM
MOTION to Dismiss1 Pro Se Complaint filed by Kika Scott (Hazard, Kaitlin) Modified on 4/28/2025 to link entries/clarify filer (sjl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Thursday, February 06, 2025
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/06 1:21 PM
NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by Alina Sunderji. (kp)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 02/06 1:20 PM
PRO SE COMPLAINT against Ur Jaddou filed by Alina Sunderji. Summonses issued. (kp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet