California Northern District Court
Judge:Charles R Breyer
Case #: 3:25-cv-01278
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Feb 06, 2025
Terminated:Feb 20, 2025
Case in other court:Sonoma County Superior Court, 24CV07820
Last checked: Sunday Mar 23, 2025 3:06 AM PDT
Defendant
City of Petaluma
Represented By
Eric Walter Danly
Petaluma City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Kelly Kathleen Houle-Sandoval
Orbach Huff Henderson LLP
contact info
Jordan Mitchell Green
City Of Petaluma
contact info
Kevin E. Gilbert
Orbach Huff & Henderson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Matt Maguire
Represented By
Eric Walter Danly
Petaluma City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Kelly Kathleen Houle-Sandoval
Orbach Huff Henderson LLP
contact info
Jordan Mitchell Green
City Of Petaluma
contact info
Kevin E. Gilbert
Orbach Huff & Henderson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Larry Modell
Represented By
Eric Walter Danly
Petaluma City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Kelly Kathleen Houle-Sandoval
Orbach Huff Henderson LLP
contact info
Jordan Mitchell Green
City Of Petaluma
contact info
Kevin E. Gilbert
Orbach Huff & Henderson LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Mary Hable
Represented By
Ward Hoskins
contact info
Plaintiff
James Heppelmann
Represented By
Ward Hoskins
contact info
Plaintiff
Donald McKinney
Represented By
Ward Hoskins
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicholas Pfendler
Represented By
Ward Hoskins
contact info
Plaintiff
Randall Smith
Represented By
Ward Hoskins
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Tavernetti
Represented By
Ward Hoskins
contact info

GPO Feb 20 2025
STIPULATION AND ORDER REMANDING CASE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/20/2025. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2025)

Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
12 12 misc Receipt Thu 03/13 8:30 AM
Receipt from Sonoma County Superior Court.(hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Saturday, February 22, 2025
11 11 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Sat 02/22 3:53 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE re remand. (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
10 10 5 pgs order Order Remanding Case Thu 02/20 9:17 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER REMANDING CASE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/20/2025. (ls, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
9 9 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 02/19 2:24 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Nicholas Pfendler, Donald McKinney, James Heppelmann, Mary Hable, Richard Tavernetti, Randall Smith.(Hoskins, Ward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate/Proof of Service
Monday, February 10, 2025
8 8 service Certificate/Proof of Service Mon 02/10 4:03 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Petaluma, Larry Modell, Matt Maguire re4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines,, (Gilbert, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
7 7 service Certificate/Proof of Service Fri 02/07 4:39 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nicholas Pfendler, Donald McKinney, James Heppelmann, Mary Hable, Richard Tavernetti, Randall Smith (Hoskins, Ward)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 02/07 4:37 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed by Randall Smith, James Heppelmann, Donald McKinney, Nicholas Pfendler, Mary Hable, Richard Tavernetti. (Hoskins, Ward)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Fri 02/07 3:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Ward Hoskins on behalf of Nicholas Pfendler, Donald McKinney, James Heppelmann, Mary Hable, Richard Tavernetti, Randall Smith (Hoskins, Ward)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Fri 02/07 3:06 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 5/23/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/30/2025 08:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (hdj, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Certificate/Proof of Service Fri 02/07 10:19 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Petaluma, Larry Modell, Matt Maguire re 2 Case Assigned by Intake,, (Gilbert, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
2 2 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 02/06 12:26 PM
Case assigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (COURT STAFF, pjf)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 02/06 11:31 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sonoma County Superior Court. Their case number is 24CV07820. (Filing fee $405 receipt number BCANDC-20320208). Filed by City of Petaluma, Matt Maguire, Larry Modell.(Gilbert, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Plaintiffs' Complaint & Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Certificate/Proof of Service