Consolidated
Lead case: 4:24-md-03132

Iowa Southern District Court
Judge:Stephen H Locher
Referred: William P Kelly
Case #: 4:25-cv-00046
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause15:1126 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Feb 06, 2025
Case in other court:Missouri Western, 4:25-cv-00050
Last checked: Sunday Mar 23, 2025 4:38 AM CDT
Defendant
Evergy Kansas Central, Inc.
Defendant
Evergy Metro, Inc.
Defendant
Evergy Missouri West, Inc.
Defendant
Evergy, Inc.
Plaintiff
Midwest Energy Emissions Corp.
Represented By
Richard A. Cochrane
Caldwell Cassady Curry, PC
contact info
Austin Curry
Caldwell Cassady Curry, PC
contact info
Bradley Wayne Caldwell
Caldwell Cassady Curry, PC
contact info
Justin Thomas Nemunaitis
Caldwell Cassady Curry, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
11 11 notice Notice - Other Tue 04/01 2:57 PM
TEXT NOTICE Case electronically transferred to the District of Kansas. (kjw)
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs order Order Tue 04/01 2:51 PM
ORDER REGARDING STIPULATION AND JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS AND TRANSFER. Defendant Evergy, Inc. is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff's claims against Evergy Kansas Central, Inc. are transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Kansas. Plaintiff's joint enterprise liability theories as to the Evergy subsidiaries are dismissed without prejudice, except as to Evergy Missouri West, Inc. and Evergy Kansas Central, Inc. In light of this stipulation, 63 Motion to Dismiss is denied as moot. See Order for further particulars. Signed by Judge Stephen H. Locher on 3/31/2025. **Docketing for purpose of transfer of case. (kjw)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Stipulation Tue 04/01 2:49 PM
STIPULATION Plaintiff ME2C's and Defendant Evergy's Stipulation and Joint Motion to Dismiss and Transfer to Resolve Evergy's Pending Motion to Dismiss by Midwest Energy Emissions Corp..(Nemunaitis, Justin) **Docketing for purpose of transfer of case. (kjw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
8 8 notice Notice - Other Thu 02/06 12:26 PM
NOTICE That 4-25-cv-46-SHL-WPK (formerly Western District of Missouri 4:25-cv-50) is now consolidated with and part of MDL No. 3132. Therefore, future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 4-24-md-3132-SHL-WPK. (kjw)
Related: [-]
7 7 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Thu 02/06 11:40 AM
Case transferred in from District of Missouri Western; Case Number 4:25-cv-00050. Original file
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 02/06 11:53 AM
Judge Stephen H. Locher and Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly added. (kjw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
6 6 MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER, CTO-2, from James Ingold, Clerk of the Panel, transferring case to Southern District of Iowa to be included in MDL No. 3132. Signed on 2/4/2025. Case electronically transferred. (Melvin, Greg)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Evergy Kansas Central, Inc., Evergy Metro, Inc., Evergy Missouri West, Inc., Evergy, Inc.. (Woods, Gloria)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
5 5 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral category I. (Woods, Gloria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MAP General Order
4 4 1 pgs Report on the filing of an action regarding patent number(s) 10,343,114, 10,589,225, 10,596,517, 10,668,430, 10,926,218, 10,933,370. Plaintiff(s): Midwest Energy Emissions Corp. Lead Attorney for Plaintiff(s): Anthony G. Simon Simon Law Firm, PC 1001 Highlands Plaza Drive Suite 300 St. Louis, MO 63110 314-241-2929 Email: asimon@simonlawpc.com Defendant(s): Evergy, Inc. et al Lead Attorney for Defendant(s): not available The civil complaint is attached. (Woods, Gloria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint
3 3 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Anthony G. Simon on behalf of Plaintiff Midwest Energy Emissions Corp..(Simon, Anthony)
Related: [-]
2 2 NOTICE of appearance by Anthony G. Simon on behalf of Midwest Energy Emissions Corp. (Simon, Anthony)
Related: [-]
1 1 41 pgs COMPLAINT against Evergy, Inc. et al. Filing fee $405, receipt number AMOWDC-9401436. Service due by 4/23/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Simon, Anthony) (Attachment 7 replaced on 1/23/2025 to close the fillable format and flatten the document.) (Woods, Gloria).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A. U.S. Patent No. 10,343,114,
Att: 2 Exhibit B. U.S. Patent No. 10,589,225,
Att: 3 Exhibit C. U.S. Patent No. 10,596,517,
Att: 4 Exhibit D. U.S. Patent No. 10,668,430,
Att: 5 Exhibit E. U.S. Patent No. 10,926,218,
Att: 6 Exhibit F. U.S. Patent No. 10,933,370,
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet