Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:James D Cain, Jr
Referred: David J Ayo
Case #: 6:25-cv-00131
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Feb 06, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 23, 2025 4:38 AM CDT
Defendant
I C Systems Inc
Represented By
Blake Edward Oakes
Oakes Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Tafaria Rubin, LA 70506
Represented By
Daniel B Centner
Peiffer Wolf Et Al
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
13 13 order Scheduling Order - Cain/LeBlanc Tue 04/15 8:14 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER Governing Pretrial Procedure: Jury Trial set for 3/23/2026 at 9:00 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 4 before Judge James D Cain Jr. Pretrial Conference set for 3/3/2026 11:00 AM in chambers before Judge James D Cain Jr. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 11/24/2025. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 12/8/2025. Amended Pleadings due by 11/24/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 12/23/2025. Daubert Motions due by 1/22/2026. Motions in Limine due by 1/22/2026. Compel discovery 1/22/2026. Deadline for filing motion for protective order is 2/23/2026. Pretrial statements due by 2/23/2026. Jury Charges/Verdict Form due by 3/9/2026. Electronic Exhibits due by 3/16/2026. Real Time glossary due by 3/16/2026. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 4/15/2025. (crt,Chicola, C)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
12 12 1 pgs order Order Tue 04/15 8:12 AM
ORDER: ORDERED that the jury trial of this matter is set for March 23, 2026, at 9:00 a.m. before Judge Cain in Courtroom 4 at the U.S. District Courthouse in Lafayette, Louisiana. ORDERED that a pretrial conference is set before Judge Cain on March 3, 2026, at 11:00 a.m. ORDERED that the office of the Clerk of Court shall issue a Scheduling Order in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 4/14/2025. (crt,Chicola, C)
Related: [-]
11 11 minutes Scheduling Conference Tue 04/15 8:11 AM
MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David J Ayo: TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 4/14/2025. (crt,Chicola, C)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
10 10 order Jurisdictional Review Finding Fri 04/11 2:41 PM
ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 4/11/2025. (crt,Kallam, M)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Order Allowing Rule 26 Report Fri 04/11 2:40 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' Rule 26(f) Report, IT IS ORDERED that the report is found to be complete. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 4/11/2025. (crt,Kallam, M)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
8 8 misc Rule 26(f) Report Tue 04/01 10:11 PM
RULE 26(f) Report by Tafaria Rubin, I C Systems Inc . (aty,Oakes, Blake)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judges By Consent (Form Included) Wed 03/19 8:31 AM
NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judges By Consent. If you wish to proceed before the magistrate judge, please complete and return the appropriate form located on this court's website by clicking[LINK:here] . Executed consent forms must be emailed to lawdml_consents@lawd.uscourts.gov. DO NOT return the form to the judges. (crt,Chicola, C)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
6 6 order Order Setting Scheduling Conference Tue 03/18 3:06 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/14/2025 04:30 PM by phone before Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. In preparation for the teleconference, the parties shall exchange initial disclosures and file a joint Rule 26 Report by 3/31/2025. During the teleconference, the parties should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, any issues requiring the Court's consideration, and the scheduling of pretrial conference and trial dates. The participants will join the teleconference by dialing 1-855-244-8681 and entering access code 2305 119 9722. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 3/18/2025. (crt,Kallam, M)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 03/19 8:31 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Rule 26 Report due by 3/31/2025. (crt,Chicola, C)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 03/11 5:12 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by I C Systems Inc. (aty,Oakes, Blake)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 03/11 5:07 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand with certificate of service by I C Systems Inc.(Attorney Blake Edward Oakes added to party I C Systems Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Oakes, Blake)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
3 3 service Affidavit of Service Thu 02/20 3:13 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service served on IC Systems Inc on 02/18/2025, filed by Tafaria Rubin. (aty,Centner, Daniel)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 02/20 4:07 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tafaria Rubin. I C Systems Inc served on 2/18/2025, answer due 3/11/2025. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY as document electronically filed in error as 3 Affidavit of Service. (crt,Crick, S) Modified on 2/20/2025 to add document number. (Crick, S)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued - All (Form Included) Thu 02/06 1:23 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to I C Systems Inc. (crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 02/06 11:31 AM
COMPLAINT against IC Systems, Inc with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-6184440) filed by Tafaria Rubin.(Attorney Daniel B Centner added to party Tafaria Rubin(pty:pla))(aty,Centner, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed summons/writ,
Att: 2 Civil cover sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 02/06 1:13 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. (crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]