New York Southern District Court
Judge:Mary Kay Vyskocil
Case #: 1:25-cv-01077
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause05:8705 Declaratory Judgment - Insurance
Case Filed:Feb 06, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 23, 2025 5:49 AM EDT
Defendant
Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By
Melissa Kelly Driscoll
Menz Bonner Komar & Koenigsberg LLP
contact info
Michael Stephen Komar
Menz Bonner Komar & Koenigsberg LLP
contact info
Defendant
BEC Group, Inc.
Plaintiff
Adidas America, Inc.
Represented By
Andrew Joseph Lise
Biedermann Hoenig Semprevivo, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company
Represented By
Andrew Joseph Lise
Biedermann Hoenig Semprevivo, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Thursday, April 03, 2025
11 11 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 04/03 3:11 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Corporate Parent The Hartford Insurance Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company for Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. Document filed by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company..(Driscoll, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
10 10 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 03/13 1:00 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Allianz of America, Inc., Other Affiliate AGCS International Holding B.V., Other Affiliate Allianz SE for Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company. Document filed by Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company..(Lise, Andrew)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 03/13 12:48 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent adidas AG, Corporate Parent adidas North America, Inc. for Adidas America, Inc.. Document filed by Adidas America, Inc...(Lise, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/03 10:44 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Joseph Lise on behalf of Adidas America, Inc., Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company..(Lise, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
7 7 misc Jury Demand Wed 02/12 4:38 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company.(Driscoll, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/10 11:44 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Melissa Kelly Driscoll on behalf of Hartford Casualty Insurance Company..(Driscoll, Melissa)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/10 11:43 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Stephen Komar on behalf of Hartford Casualty Insurance Company..(Komar, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Removal Fri 02/07 4:03 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 654230/2024..Document filed by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company..(Driscoll, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Answer,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - BEC Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Reply,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Stip Withrawing BEC Motion,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Stip of Discontinuance,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Order on BEC Motion
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Fri 02/07 2:04 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Melissa Kelly Driscoll to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not properly signed. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Fri 02/07 2:07 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Melissa Kelly Driscoll. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Plaintiff code 2 (Citizen of Another State); Citizenship Defendant code 2 (Citizen of Another State); County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 02/07 2:09 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 02/07 2:10 PM
Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 02/07 2:10 PM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 02/06 4:09 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Driscoll, Melissa)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 02/06 4:08 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company for Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. Document filed by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company..(Driscoll, Melissa)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs notice Notice of Removal Thu 02/06 4:04 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 654230/2024. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30579129).Document filed by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, BEC Group, Inc...(Driscoll, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 115 pgs Exhibit A - Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Answer,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - BEC Motion,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Reply,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Stip Withrawing BEC Motion,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Stip of Discontinuance,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Order on BEC Motion