Wisconsin Western District Court
Judge:James D Peterson
Referred: Anita Marie Boor
Case #: 3:25-cv-00087
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Feb 06, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 23, 2025 5:00 AM CDT
Defendant
Madison Emergency Physicians, S.C.
Plaintiff
Stacy Schmidt
Represented By
Natalie Lauren Gerloff
Hawks Quindel, S.C.
contact info
David C. Zoeller
Hawks Quindel, S.C.
contact info
Connor J. Clegg
Hawks Quindel, S.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 43 minutes ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
11 11 6 pgs order Pretrial Conference Order Fri 05/02 10:34 AM
Pretrial Conference Order -[LINK:Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson] attached. Amendments to Pleadings due 7/25/2025. Motion for Conditional Certification of Class due 8/15/2025. Motion to Certify Class under Rule 23 due 12/12/2025. Dispositive Motions due 6/10/2026. Settlement Letters due 10/2/2026. Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures and Motions in Limine due 10/16/2026. Responses due 11/6/2026. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/25/2026 at 02:30 PM. Second Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/2/2026 at 02:30 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 12/7/2026 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anita Marie Boor on 5/1/2025. (rks)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
minutes Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference Thu 05/01 4:24 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Anita Marie Boor: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 5/1/2025 [00:25] (ckl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
10 10 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Wed 04/23 1:24 PM
Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Gerloff, Natalie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
utility Set Pretrial or Status Conference Tue 04/01 9:53 AM
Set Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 5/1/2025 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Anita M. Boor. Please call (669) 254-5252 and enter meeting ID 161 2455 6623 when prompted. Wait to be admitted into the conference. The parties are advised that a Rule 26(f) conference shall occur not less than two weeks before the preliminary pretrial conference, and that the parties' report or reports must be filed not less than one week before the preliminary pretrial conference.[[LINK:Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference] attached] [[LINK:Procedures for Requesting a Hearing to Resolve a Deposition Dispute] attached] (rks)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/31 4:18 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Eric Locker for Defendant Madison Emergency Physicians, S.C.. (Locker, Eric)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/31 4:16 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Thomas G. O'Day for Defendant Madison Emergency Physicians, S.C.. (O'Day, Thomas)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 03/31 4:14 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Madison Emergency Physicians, S.C.. (Heneghan, Thomas)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/31 4:13 PM
ANSWER by Defendant Madison Emergency Physicians, S.C.. (Heneghan, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/21 12:29 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Connor J. Clegg for Plaintiff Stacy Schmidt. (Clegg, Connor)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Acknowledgment of Service Fri 02/21 12:10 PM
Acknowledgment of Service Executed as to3 Summons Issued,1 Complaint,2 Notice of Appearance filed by Plaintiff Stacy Schmidt. (Zoeller, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 02/06 2:31 PM
Summons Issued as to Madison Emergency Physicians, S.C. (lak)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/06 12:17 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Natalie Lauren Gerloff for Plaintiff Stacy Schmidt. (Gerloff, Natalie)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 02/06 12:15 PM
COMPLAINT against Defendant ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AWIWDC-3559949.), filed by Plaintiff. (Zoeller, David) Modified on 2/6/2025. (lak)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Consent Form,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Employment Contract,
Att: 3 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Summons
utility Add Judge for Shell Case Opening Thu 02/06 2:30 PM
Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Anita Marie Boor. (lak)
Related: [-]
utility Standard Attachments Sent Thu 02/06 2:30 PM
Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service:[LINK:NORTC] ,[LINK:Corporate Disclosure Statement] . (lak)
Related: [-]