Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Matthew J Kacsmaryk
Referred: Lee Ann Reno
Case #: 2:25-cv-00029
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Case Filed:Feb 06, 2025
Terminated:Mar 03, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Monday, March 24, 2025
7 7 utility Mail Returned (Public Entry with Option to Restrict) Mon 03/24 9:33 AM
Mail returned as undeliverable.6 Judgment,5 Order Adopting Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendation received back from Deshane Genarro Jefferson as RTS, Not Here, Unable to Forward. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (awc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
6 6 order Judgment Mon 03/03 4:22 PM
JUDGMENT: The Court has entered its order ADOPTING the findings, conclusions, and recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge in this case. Accordingly, this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 3/3/2025) (awc)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations Mon 03/03 4:20 PM
ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION re:4 Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendation. (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 3/3/2025) (awc)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Mon 03/03 4:23 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5,6. Mon Mar 3 16:23:14 CST 2025 (crt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
misc Order Receipt Tue 02/11 9:31 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Tue Feb 11 09:31:12 CST 2025 (crt)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
4 4 motion Findings and Recommendations Mon 02/10 4:31 PM
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT re:3 Complaint. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 2/10/2025) (ars)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Mon 02/10 4:31 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Mon Feb 10 16:31:48 CST 2025 (crt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
3 3 cmp Complaint Thu 02/06 2:32 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Deshane Ganarro Jefferson. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ars)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party Thu 02/06 2:27 PM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (ars)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 General Order Concerning Litigation
1 1 qcref Kacsmaryk Thu 02/06 2:26 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Reno (see Special Order 3). No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] and[LINK:circuit] indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Reno). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ars)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Thu 02/06 2:33 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. Copy of first page of file-marked complaint also mailed. Thu Feb 6 14:33:58 CST 2025 (crt)
Related: [-]