Staci Montgomery v. City of Newport Beach et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Douglas F Mccormick |
Case #: | 8:25-cv-00228 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Feb 06, 2025 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 23, 2025 3:17 AM PDT |
Defendant
City of Newport Beach
|
|
Defendant
Newport Beach Police Department
|
|
Defendant
Matthew Wong
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Staci Montgomery
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 18 minutes ago |
Wednesday, May 14, 2025 | ||
12 | 12
![]() STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to August 20, 2025 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Staci Montgomery.(Casillas, Arnoldo) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, May 05, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Staci Montgomery, upon Defendant City of Newport Beach served on 5/1/2025, answer due 5/22/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jennifer M - person in charge of office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Casillas, Arnoldo) |
|
10 | 10
![]() PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Staci Montgomery, upon Defendant Newport Beach Police Department served on 5/1/2025, answer due 5/22/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Officer Atkins - authorized in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Casillas, Arnoldo) |
|
9 | 9
![]() PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Staci Montgomery, upon Defendant Matthew Wong served on 5/1/2025, answer due 5/22/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Officer Atkins - authorized in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Casillas, Arnoldo) |
|
Friday, March 07, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Staci Montgomery. (Casillas, Arnoldo) |
|
Monday, February 10, 2025 | ||
7 | 7
![]() NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 . The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. Other error(s) with document(s): Civil Cover Sheet not formatted correctly.. (sh) |
|
6 | 6
![]() 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants City of Newport Beach, Newport Beach Police Department, Matthew Wong. (sh) |
|
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (sh) |
|
Thursday, February 06, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Staci Montgomery. (Gillette, Daniel) |
|
3 | 3
![]() NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Staci Montgomery, (Gillette, Daniel) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Staci Montgomery. (Gillette, Daniel) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39058219 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Staci Montgomery. (Attorney Daniel W Gillette added to party Staci Montgomery(pty:pla))(Gillette, Daniel) |