California Central District Court
Judge:Douglas F Mccormick
Case #: 8:25-cv-00228
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Feb 06, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 23, 2025 3:17 AM PDT
Defendant
City of Newport Beach
Defendant
Newport Beach Police Department
Defendant
Matthew Wong
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Staci Montgomery
Represented By
Arnoldo Casillas
Casillas And Associates
contact info
Daniel W Gillette
Casillas And Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
12 12 stip Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days) Wed 05/14 8:42 AM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to August 20, 2025 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Staci Montgomery.(Casillas, Arnoldo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, May 05, 2025
11 11 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 05/05 3:58 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Staci Montgomery, upon Defendant City of Newport Beach served on 5/1/2025, answer due 5/22/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jennifer M - person in charge of office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Casillas, Arnoldo)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 05/05 12:10 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Staci Montgomery, upon Defendant Newport Beach Police Department served on 5/1/2025, answer due 5/22/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Officer Atkins - authorized in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Casillas, Arnoldo)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 05/05 12:07 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Staci Montgomery, upon Defendant Matthew Wong served on 5/1/2025, answer due 5/22/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Officer Atkins - authorized in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Casillas, Arnoldo)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
8 8 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 03/07 1:57 PM
AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Staci Montgomery. (Casillas, Arnoldo)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
7 7 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Mon 02/10 10:09 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 . The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. Other error(s) with document(s): Civil Cover Sheet not formatted correctly.. (sh)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 02/10 10:08 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants City of Newport Beach, Newport Beach Police Department, Matthew Wong. (sh)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Notice of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent CV-20B optional html form Mon 02/10 10:07 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (sh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
4 4 notice Summons Request Thu 02/06 2:04 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Staci Montgomery. (Gillette, Daniel)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 02/06 2:03 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Staci Montgomery, (Gillette, Daniel)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 02/06 2:02 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Staci Montgomery. (Gillette, Daniel)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 02/06 1:57 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39058219 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Staci Montgomery. (Attorney Daniel W Gillette added to party Staci Montgomery(pty:pla))(Gillette, Daniel)
Related: [-]