New York Southern District Court
Judge:Cathy Seibel
Case #: 7:25-cv-01088
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Case Filed:Feb 06, 2025
Terminated:Mar 12, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 23, 2025 5:51 AM EDT
Defendant
Gianfia Corp.
179 Brady Ave.
Hawthorne, NY 10532
Defendant
Ralph Ruggiero
179 Brady Ave.
Hawthorne, NY 10532
Plaintiff
Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement, and Legal Services Funds
Represented By
Daniel E Kornfeld
Blitman & King LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 03/11 10:29 AM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Gianfia Corp., Ralph Ruggiero. Document filed by Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement, and Legal Services Funds. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Kornfeld, Daniel)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Voluntary Dismissal Tue 03/11 10:18 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Daniel E Kornfeld. RE-FILE Document No. 9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal,,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the voluntary dismissal is against was/were selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Notice of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Notices - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. (nd)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 03/10 9:10 AM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement, and Legal Services Funds. Document filed by Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement, and Legal Services Funds. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Kornfeld, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
8 8 service Certificate of Service Other Mon 02/10 4:17 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on Scott Bessent, Secretary of the Treasury and Vincent Micone, Secretary of the Department of Labor on 02/10/2025. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement, and Legal Services Funds..(Kornfeld, Daniel)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 02/10 9:55 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kornfeld, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
6 6 service Summons Issued Fri 02/07 12:31 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ralph Ruggiero..(jgo)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 02/07 12:30 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gianfia Corp...(jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Fri 02/07 12:25 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Daniel E Kornfeld re: Document No. 1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF;. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Fri 02/07 12:26 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Daniel E Kornfeld to RE-FILE Document No. 4 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated December 4, 2024;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated December 4, 2024. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated December 4, 2024 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-cover-sheet-2.. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Fri 02/07 12:27 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Daniel E Kornfeld. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement, and Legal Services Fund. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 02/07 12:28 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 02/07 12:29 PM
Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 02/07 12:30 PM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
4 4 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 02/06 4:10 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kornfeld, Daniel)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 02/06 4:10 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ralph Ruggiero, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement, and Legal Services Funds by Louis A. Picani, Joseph Sansone, Dominick Cassanelli, Jr., Roger Taranto..(Kornfeld, Daniel)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 02/06 4:09 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Gianfia Corp., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement, and Legal Services Funds by Louis A. Picani, Joseph Sansone, Dominick Cassanelli, Jr., Roger Taranto..(Kornfeld, Daniel)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 02/06 4:06 PM
COMPLAINT against Gianfia Corp., Ralph Ruggiero. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30579274)Document filed by Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement, and Legal Services Funds by Louis A. Picani, Joseph Sansone, Dominick Cassanelli, Jr., Roger Taranto..(Kornfeld, Daniel)
Related: [-]