Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Joseph F Saporito, Jr
Case #: 3:25-cv-00226
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Case Filed:Feb 05, 2025
Terminated:Apr 15, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 22, 2025 12:06 PM EDT
Defendant
Giannina McKee
Represented By
Thomas P. Stevens
Horn Williamson LLC
contact info
Matthew Collins
Horn Williamson, LLP
contact info
Megan K. Shannon
Mccarter & English
contact info
Plaintiff
Jessica Fox Swiatkowski
Represented By
Robert R. Axenfeld
Axenfeld Law Group, LLC
contact info
Stephanie J Mensing
Mensing Law LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
24 24 2 pgs order Order Approving Stipulation Tue 05/20 12:24 PM
Order approving re23 Notice of Settlement Signed by District Judge Joseph F Saporito, Jr on 5/20/25. (ms)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 19, 2025
23 23 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 05/19 10:40 AM
NOTICE of Settlement Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order of Dismissal by Jessica Fox Swiatkowski (Axenfeld, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
22 22 misc Transcript Wed 05/14 2:52 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 4/15/2025, before Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr.. Court Reporter SUZANNE A HALKO, Telephone number 5702371867. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/4/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/16/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/12/2025. (cr2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
21 21 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case (60 Day Settlement Order) Tue 04/15 2:00 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by District Judge Joseph F Saporito, Jr on 4/15/25. (ms)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
19 19 motion Dismiss Mon 04/14 3:14 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Counts I and III of Complaint and Compel Arbitration by Giannina McKee.(Shannon, Megan)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
18 18 order Scheduling Order Mon 04/07 11:47 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Prel/Perm Injunction Hearing set for 4/15/2025 11:00 AM in Wilkes-Barre - Courtroom 3 before District Judge Joseph F Saporito Jr.. Signed by District Judge Joseph F Saporito, Jr on 4/7/25. (ms)(Copy to Scranton Court Reporters)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
17 17 misc Letter Thu 03/27 3:33 PM
Letter from Robert R. Axenfeld regarding Stay in AAA Arbitration Proceeding, filed by Jessica Fox Swiatkowski .(Axenfeld, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A Stay Order AAA
Sunday, February 23, 2025
16 16 respm Reply Brief Sun 02/23 10:40 PM
REPLY BRIEF re4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Jessica Fox Swiatkowski.(Axenfeld, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
15 15 respm Brief in Opposition (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Wed 02/19 3:59 PM
BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Giannina McKee.(Shannon, Megan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1 and 2,
Att: 2 Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Memo
Monday, February 17, 2025
14 14 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Mon 02/17 8:49 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas P. Stevens on behalf of Giannina McKee (Stevens, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
13 13 misc Exhibit Thu 02/13 2:10 PM
EXHIBIT 1 - Amended Declaration of Jessica Fox Swiatkowski in Support of Motion for TRO + PI (Doc. 4-1) by Jessica Fox Swiatkowski re4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION . (Axenfeld, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 02/12 5:53 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT -First Amended Complaint against Giannina McKee, filed by Jessica Fox Swiatkowski.(Axenfeld, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A Three-Month-Mentorship Agreement
11 11 2 pgs order Order Wed 02/12 10:38 AM
ORDER re4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Jessica Fox Swiatkowski - defendant shall file a brief in opposition to Doc. 4 motion within 7 days of date of this order; plaintiff's reply due within 5 days of defendant's filing of opposition brief. Signed by District Judge Joseph F Saporito, Jr on 2/12/25. (ms)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
10 10 order Special Admissions Form Approved Tue 02/11 3:24 PM
SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Robert R. Axenfeld Signed by District Judge Joseph F Saporito, Jr on 2/11/25. (ms)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
9 9 misc Certificate Mon 02/10 8:00 PM
CERTIFICATE of signed Sponsor's Certificate by Jessica Fox Swiatkowski re6 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice (signed Sponsor's Certificate [Doc. 6] . (Axenfeld, Robert)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Mon 02/10 7:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Megan K. Shannon on behalf of Giannina McKee (Shannon, Megan)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Mon 02/10 7:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Collins on behalf of Giannina McKee (Collins, Matthew)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Mon 02/10 3:52 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Axenfeld is directed to submit a signed Sponsor's Certificate in conjunction with his Doc. 6 petition for special admission (ms)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
6 6 misc Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/06 5:29 PM
PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Robert R. Axenfeld on behalf of Jessica Fox Swiatkowski Attorney Robert Axenfeld is seeking special admission Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-6893739.. (Axenfeld, Robert)
Related: [-]
5 5 respm Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Thu 02/06 3:27 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Jessica Fox Swiatkowski.(Mensing, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Temporary Restraining Order Thu 02/06 3:26 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Jessica Fox Swiatkowski.(Mensing, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration DECLARATION OF JESSICA FOX SWIATKOWSKI,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
3 3 misc Exhibit Thu 02/06 3:17 PM
EXHIBIT A by Jessica Fox Swiatkowski re1 Complaint. (Mensing, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 02/06 12:38 PM
Summons Issued as to Giannina McKee and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (dw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Packet
misc Docket Annotation Thu 02/06 12:39 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Plaintiff's counsel is requested to file missing Exhibit(s) to Complaint. (dw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
1 1 16 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 02/06 12:37 PM
COMPLAINT against Giannina McKee aka Gia Rose ( Filing fee $405, Receipt Number APAMDC-6892284), filed by Jessica Fox Swiatkowski.(dw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet