Texas Western District Court
Case #: 2:25-cr-00338
Case Filed:Feb 05, 2025
Last checked: Friday Feb 07, 2025 1:52 AM CST
Defendant
Juan Jose Matute-Flores (1)
Represented By
ALFREDO D. MARES
Alfredo Mares Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Nallely Duarte
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/07/2025 5:04 AM CST
Thursday, January 09, 2025
Arrest of Juan Jose Matute-Flores (drda) [2:25-mj-00120-MHW]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
Warrant Returned Executed as to Juan Jose Matute-Flores. (drda) [2:25-mj-00120-MHW]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters as to Juan Jose Matute-Flores. (drda) [2:25-mj-00120-MHW]
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Matthew H. Watters as to Juan Jose Matute-Flores. (drda) [2:25-mj-00120-MHW]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
ORAL MOTION to Continue, ORAL MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to USA as to Juan Jose Matute-Flores. (drda) [2:25-mj-00120-MHW]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER GRANTING ORAL Motion to Continue as to Juan Jose Matute-Flores (1); GRANTING ORAL Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond as to Juan Jose Matute-Flores (1).By Judge Matthew H. Watters. (drda) [2:25-mj-00120-MHW]
Related: [-]
3 3 Proceedings held before Judge Matthew H. Watters:Initial Appearance as to Juan Jose Matute-Flores held on 1/14/2025 Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing set for 1/17/2025 9:00AM before Judge Matthew H. Watters, SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to Juan Jose Matute-Flores (Court Reporter FTR GOLD - C. LEVRIE.) (drda) [2:25-mj-00120-MHW]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL ALFREDO D. MARES for Juan Jose Matute-Flores appointed. Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters. (ic) [2:25-mj-00120-MHW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
5 5 Waiver of Preliminary and Detention Hearing by Juan Jose Matute-Flores (MARES, ALFREDO) [2:25-mj-00120-MHW]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
6 6 ORDER OF DETENTION: Bond set to No Bond as to Juan Jose Matute-Flores. Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters. (r013) [2:25-mj-00120-MHW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
7 7 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Juan Jose Matute-Flores (1) count(s) 1. (bot2)
Related: [-] dacted Version
9 9 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Juan Jose Matute-Flores (bot1)
Related: [-]