Delaware District Court
Judge:Colm F Connolly
Case #: 1:25-cv-00153
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause15:0045 Federal Trade Commission Act
Case Filed:Feb 07, 2025
Terminated:Apr 11, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 24, 2025 5:27 AM EDT
Defendant
John Chartrand
Represented By
Elio Battista, Jr.
Parkowski, Guerke & Swayze, P.A.
contact info
Madeline Susan Carlson
Parkowski, Guerke & Swayze, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Del-One Federal Credit Union
Represented By
Elio Battista, Jr.
Parkowski, Guerke & Swayze, P.A.
contact info
Madeline Susan Carlson
Parkowski, Guerke & Swayze, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Godspeed Transport LLC
Plaintiff
Alexander Sinai
on behalf of Godspeed Transport LLC 307 Pennsylvania Ave
Wilmington, DE 19804

GPO Apr 11 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/11/2025. (mws)

Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, April 11, 2025
30 30 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 04/11 1:47 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE (CASE CLOSED). Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/11/2025. ***Copy mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff on 4/11/2025*** (mws)
Related: [-]
29 29 7 pgs order Opinion - Memorandum Opinion Fri 04/11 1:47 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/11/2025. (mws)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
utility - CORRECTING ENTRY Thu 04/10 9:28 AM
CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket entry originally docketed as a motion has been re-filed as a sur-reply brief in opposition to D.I.26 . (mrr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
28 28 motion Motion Filed Wed 04/09 4:27 PM
SUR-REPLY BRIEF in response to re26 First REPLY BRIEF Defendants' Partial Reply In Support of Motion to Dismiss, Or, In the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendants', Del-One Federal Credit Union and John Chartrand's Motion to Dismiss, or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement filed by Alexander Sinai.(mrr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Compliance,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
utility - CORRECTING ENTRY Wed 04/09 3:19 PM
CORRECTING ENTRY: The docket entry originally docketed as a motion has been re-filed as reply brief in support of D.I. 9. (scs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
27 27 respm Brief - Reply Wed 04/09 3:14 PM
REPLY BRIEF in support of D.I.9 MOTION for Issuance of Subpoena filed by Alexander Sinai.(scs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Compliance,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
26 26 respm Brief - Reply Tue 04/08 3:31 PM
First REPLY BRIEF Defendants' Partial Reply In Support of Motion to Dismiss, Or, In the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement filed by John Chartrand, Del-One Federal Credit Union.(Carlson, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service,
Att: 2 Certificate of Compliance
utility - CORRECTING ENTRY Tue 04/08 10:56 AM
CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket entries originally docketed as motions have been re-filed as answering briefs in opposition to D.I. 19. (slk)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
25 25 misc Affidavit Mon 04/07 3:28 PM
AFFIDAVIT of of Fact re24 Exhibit to a Document,22 MOTION in Response to Subject Matter Jurisdiction and the Amount in Controversy Exceeds $75,000 re19 MOTION to Stay re17 Affidavit,12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendants', Del-One Federal Credit Uni, 23 MOTION in Support of Claim, 21 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Alexander Sinai. (slk)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Exhibit to a Document Mon 04/07 3:25 PM
EVIDENCE to Support Claim and a More Definite Statement, Exhibits A-G re1 Complaint (Pro Se) by Alexander Sinai. (slk)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 04/07 3:22 PM
MOTION in Support of Claim - filed by Alexander Sinai. (slk)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 04/07 3:20 PM
MOTION in Response to Subject Matter Jurisdiction and the Amount in Controversy Exceeds $75,00019 - filed by Alexander Sinai. (slk)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion More Definite Statement Mon 04/07 3:16 PM
MOTION in Response to a More Definite Statement19 - filed by Alexander Sinai. (slk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service,
Att: 2 Certificate of Compliance
20 20 respm Response to Motion Mon 04/07 2:09 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re9 MOTION for Issuance of Subpoena - filed by John Chartrand, Del-One Federal Credit Union.(Carlson, Madeline) Modified on 4/7/2025 (mpb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 [Proposed Order],
Att: 2 Certificate of Service,
Att: 3 Certificate of Compliance
utility - CORRECTING ENTRY Mon 04/07 2:36 PM
CORRECTING ENTRY: Per Counsel's request, the docket text of D.I.20 has been modified to reflect it is only in response to D.I.9 Motion for Issuance of Subpoena. (mpb)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
19 19 motion Stay Fri 04/04 11:47 AM
MOTION to Stay re17 Affidavit,12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendants', Del-One Federal Credit Union and John Chartrand's Motion to Dismiss, or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement ,15 Opening Brief in Support,,16 Response to Motion,,13 Answering Brief in Opposition,14 MOTION to Correct Record and Address Unsupported Claim Prior to Hearing Defendant's re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendants', Del-One Federal Credit Union and John Chartrand's Motion to Dismiss, or, in t, 18 Exhibit to a Document - filed by John Chartrand, Del-One Federal Credit Union.(Carlson, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 [Proposed Order],
Att: 2 Certificate of Service,
Att: 3 Certificate of Compliance
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
18 18 misc Exhibit to a Document Wed 04/02 2:10 PM
[SEALED] EXHIBIT re17 Affidavit by Alexander Sinai.(slk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
17 17 misc Affidavit Wed 04/02 2:09 PM
AFFIDAVIT of of Fact filed by Alexander Sinai. (slk)
Related: [-]
16 16 respm Response to Motion Wed 04/02 11:10 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re14 MOTION to Correct Record and Address Unsupported Claim Prior to Hearing Defendant's re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendants', Del-One Federal Credit Union and John Chartrand's Motion to Dismiss, or, in t he Alternative, for a More Definite Statement filed by John Chartrand, Del-One Federal Credit Union.(Carlson, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Compliance,
Att: 2 Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
15 15 respm Brief - Opening Brief in Support Wed 04/02 10:41 AM
Amended OPENING BRIEF in Support re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendants', Del-One Federal Credit Union and John Chartrand's Motion to Dismiss, or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement filed by John Chartrand, Del-One Federal Credit Union.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/16/2025.(Carlson, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Redline of Amended Opening Brief,
Att: 2 Certificate of Compliance,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
14 14 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 04/01 4:11 PM
Emergency MOTION to Correct Record and Address Unsupported Claims Prior to Hearing Defendant's re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendants', Del-One Federal Credit Union and John Chartrand's Motion to Dismiss, or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement - filed by Alexander Sinai. (oam)
Related: [-]
13 13 respm Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition Tue 04/01 4:05 PM
ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendants', Del-One Federal Credit Union and John Chartrand's Motion to Dismiss, or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement filed by Alexander Sinai.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 4/8/2025. (oam)
Related: [-]
utility -SET ANSWERING BRIEF - no open brief w/ Motion Tue 04/01 4:56 PM
Set Answering Brief Deadline re14 MOTION to Correct Record and Address Unsupported ClaimAnswering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/15/2025. (mws)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
12 12 motion Dismiss/Fail to State Claim Mon 03/31 1:30 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendants', Del-One Federal Credit Union and John Chartrand's Motion to Dismiss, or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement - filed by John Chartrand, Del-One Federal Credit Union.(Carlson, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Defendants Opening Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, or, in Alternative, for a More Definite Statement,
Att: 2 Proposed Order to Defendants Opening Brief,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service,
Att: 4 Certificate of Compliance
Thursday, March 27, 2025
11 11 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Thu 03/27 1:59 PM
ORDER granting10 MOTION to Withdraw. Party Godspeed Transport LLC terminated. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/27/2025. ***Copy mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff on 3/27/2025*** (mws)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
10 10 motion Withdraw Tue 03/25 9:36 AM
MOTION to Withdraw Plaintiff Godspeed Transport LLC - filed by Alexander Sinai.(oam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-F
9 9 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 03/25 9:23 AM
MOTION for Issuance of Subpoena - filed by Alexander Sinai. (oam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
8 8 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 03/12 1:19 PM
ORDER granting3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Within thirty days from the date of this Order, Plaintiff Godspeed Transport LLC shall either (1) obtain Delaware counsel and have counsel enter appearance in this case, or (2) move to withdraw from this case. Failure to timely comply with this Order may result in dismissal of this case without prejudice. Set Deadlines: (Notice of Compliance deadline set for 4/11/2025). Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/12/2025. ***Copy mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff on 3/12/2025*** (mws)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
7 7 motion Amend/Correct Wed 03/05 2:58 PM
MOTION to Amend (D.I.6 ) Amended Complaint - filed by Godspeed Transport LLC, Alexander Sinai.(cdd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Amended Complaint
utility - CORRECTING ENTRY Wed 03/05 2:59 PM
CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I.7 has been refiled as a MOTION to amend complaint as complaint has previously been amended per D.I.6 . (cdd)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
6 6 cmp Complaint - Amended Fri 02/28 4:03 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against John Chartrand, Del-One Federal Credit Union- filed by Alexander Sinai.(oam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/26 2:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Elio Battista, Jr and Madeline Susan Carlson on behalf of All Defendants(Carlson, Madeline) Modified on 2/26/2025 (kmd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 02/12 11:01 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
4 4 misc Exhibit to a Document Mon 02/10 3:52 PM
ADDENDUM to1 Complaint (Pro Se), and Civil Cover Sheet, by Alexander Sinai.(scs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 02/10 3:50 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Alexander Sinai. (scs)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
2 2 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Fri 02/07 2:36 PM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mpb)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint - Pro Se Non-Prisoner Fri 02/07 2:26 PM
COMPLAINT filed Pro Se with Jury Demand against John Chartrand, Del-One Federal Credit Union - filed by Godspeed Transport LLC, Alexander Sinai. (No Civil Cover, No IFP)(mpb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Intent
utility Remark Fri 02/07 2:39 PM
Remark: An Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Magistrate Consent Form, Acknowledgment, and Pro-se Privacy Notice were provided to the Plaintiff at the front counter of the Clerk's Office. (mpb)
Related: [-]