Tennessee Western District Court
Judge:Thomas L Parker
Referred: Tu M Pham
Case #: 2:25-cv-02133
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Feb 07, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 24, 2025 4:09 AM CDT
Defendant
Equifax
Represented By
Adam Theodore Hill
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Jennifer R. Brooks
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kendrick Robinson
4850 Summer Lane
Memphis, TN 38118


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
18 18 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 03/25 1:47 PM
MOTION for Status Hearing filed by Kendrick Robinson. (cmm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
17 17 motion Disqualify Judge Thu 03/13 12:51 PM
MOTION to Disqualify Judge by Kendrick Robinson. (jae)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 03/13 8:51 AM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Equifax.(Hill, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F,
Att: 8 Exhibit G
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
15 15 motion Disqualify Judge Tue 03/04 3:58 PM
MOTION to Disqualify Magistrate Judge by Kendrick Robinson. (jae)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/27 4:09 PM
ORDER Granting10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on February 27, 2025. (hlb)
Related: [-]
13 13 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 02/27 1:33 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Equifax, filed by Kendrick Robinson.(cmm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits
12 12 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 02/27 1:02 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax identifying Corporate Parent EQUIFAX INC. for Equifax.. (Hill, Adam)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/27 12:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Theodore Hill on behalf of Equifax (Hill, Adam)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/27 10:30 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-4626528) by Equifax.(Brooks, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing - USDC ND TX,
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing - Texas Supreme Court
Monday, February 24, 2025
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Mon 02/24 3:16 PM
FUTURE Response to defend motion to dismiss by Kendrick Robinson(jae)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Thursday, February 13, 2025
8 8 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 02/13 4:46 PM
ORDER Granting3 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on February 13, 2025. (hlb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
7 7 service Certificate of Service Wed 02/12 1:16 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kendrick Robinson re2 Pro Se Complaint (jae)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
6 6 notice Notice LR 72.1 - Right to Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge Fri 02/07 12:06 PM
NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (cmm)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice LR 16.2 Fri 02/07 12:06 PM
NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (cmm)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice ADR Compliance Fri 02/07 12:06 PM
NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (cmm)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 02/07 12:05 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kendrick Robinson. (cmm)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Pro Se Complaint Fri 02/07 12:04 PM
PRO SE COMPLAINT against Equifax, filed by Kendrick Robinson.(cmm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 NEF,
Att: 3 Exhibits
1 1 utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 02/07 12:02 PM
Judge Thomas L. Parker and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (cmm)
Related: [-]