Colorado District Court
Judge:Maritza Dominguez Braswel
Case #: 1:25-cv-00410
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Feb 07, 2025
Terminated:Apr 25, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 24, 2025 2:47 AM MDT
Defendant
Andre Beach
Defendant
Julia Brinley
Defendant
Colorado Springs Neurological Associates, P.C.
Plaintiff
Christen Kutz
Represented By
Christopher George Wilhelmi
Stinar Zendejas & Gaithe, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Friday, April 25, 2025
16 16 utility Terminate Civil Case - PUBLIC Fri 04/25 3:41 PM
Civil Case Administratively Closed pursuant to 15 MINUTE ORDER filed in this case on 4/25/2025. Text Only Entry (amona,)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Minute Order Fri 04/25 11:30 AM
MINUTE ORDER: The parties have not filed responses to the14 Order to Show Cause. Accordingly, the Order to Show Cause is made absolute, and the case is administratively closed pending arbitration. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 4/25/2025. Text Only Entry (mdblc5)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
14 14 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 04/14 2:47 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. It is ORDERED that, to the extent either or both Parties object to an administrative closure, they show cause, in writing, as to why this Court should not order this case administratively closed. Any such showing must be made on or before April 22, 2025. If neither Party objects, no submission is necessary, and the Court will proceed to order administrative closure. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 4/14/2025. (amona, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
13 13 order Order on Motion to Stay Fri 04/11 11:59 AM
MINUTE ORDER: On review of the6 Joint Motion Requesting Court to Stay Claims Pending Completion of Arbitration, the Court finds the factors set forth in String Cheese Incident, LLC v. Stylus Shows, Inc. , 2006 WL 894955 (D. Colo. Mar. 30, 2006) weigh in favor of a stay. Thus, all proceedings are stayed pending arbitration. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 4/11/2025. Text Only Entry (mdblc5)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
12 12 order Order on Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge Wed 04/09 12:37 PM
ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge8 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(c), by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/09/2025. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Tue 04/08 2:41 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Paul W. Hurcomb on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Paul W. Hurcomb added to party Colorado Springs Neurological Associates, P.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Paul W. Hurcomb added to party Andre Beach(pty:dft), Attorney Paul W. Hurcomb added to party Julia Brinley(pty:dft) (Hurcomb, Paul)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Tue 04/08 2:30 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jessica L. Kyle on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Jessica L. Kyle added to party Colorado Springs Neurological Associates, P.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica L. Kyle added to party Andre Beach(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica L. Kyle added to party Julia Brinley(pty:dft) (Kyle, Jessica)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Minute Order Tue 04/08 11:07 AM
MINUTE ORDER: The8 Consent Form is signed by Jessica L. Kyle, who has not entered an appearance. The Court cannot consider the form until counsel enters their appearance. Counsel shall enter an appearance by April 10, 2025. Plaintiff's counsel shall transmit this Minute Order to Defendants' counsel. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 4/8/2025. Text Only Entry (mdblc5)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
8 8 misc Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge Mon 04/07 3:51 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Christen Kutz All parties consent.. (Wilhelmi, Christopher)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Minute Order Mon 04/07 1:45 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Today's consent deadline is maintained, but all other deadlines are vacated pending resolution of the6 Motion to Stay. The Court will decide the Motion to Stay if and when the parties consent to the Court's jurisdiction. If the parties do not consent, the Motion to Stay will be decided upon referral. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 4/7/2025. Text Only Entry (mdblc5)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Stay Mon 04/07 11:13 AM
Joint MOTION to Stay Claims Pending Completion of Arbitration by Plaintiff Christen Kutz. (Wilhelmi, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
5 5 4 pgs order Order Mon 02/24 1:51 PM
ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. Consent Form due by 4/7/2025. Proposed Scheduling Order due 4/7/2025. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 2/24/2025. (evaug)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
4 4 service Waiver of Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Tue 02/11 2:38 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christen Kutz. Andre Beach waiver sent on 2/10/2025, answer due 4/11/2025; Julia Brinley waiver sent on 2/10/2025, answer due 4/11/2025; Colorado Springs Neurological Associates, P.C. waiver sent on 2/10/2025, answer due 4/11/2025.(Wilhelmi, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Waiver of Service,
Att: 2 Waiver of Service
Friday, February 07, 2025
3 3 misc Summons Issued Fri 02/07 12:04 PM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (efoga, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form
2 2 misc Case Assigned to Judge Fri 02/07 12:01 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 02/07 11:55 AM
COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Andre Beach, Julia Brinley, Colorado Springs Neurological Associates, P.C. (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-10138503)Attorney Christopher George Wilhelmi added to party Christen Kutz(pty:pla), filed by Christen Kutz.(Wilhelmi, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons CSNA,
Att: 4 Summons Beach,
Att: 5 Summons Brinley