Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Robert J White
Referred: Kimberly G Altman
Case #: 2:25-cv-10369
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Case Filed:Feb 07, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 24, 2025 5:03 AM EDT
Defendant
Jason J Carik
242 S. Western Ave.
Bartlett, IL 60103
Defendant
Market Performance Group, LLC
3100 SW Regency Pkwy.
Bentonville, AR 72712
Plaintiff
Berg Marketing Group, Inc.
Suite 125
Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304
Represented By
Michael L. Geller
Strobl PLLC
contact info
Henry J. Andries, Jr.
Strobl PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
16 16 order Scheduling Order Thu 05/08 12:00 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/3/2025; Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 11/14/2025; Remote Interim Status Conference set for 11/5/2025 at 11:30 AM before District Judge Robert J. White. Signed by District Judge Robert J. White. Related [+] (TVil)
Related: [-] fer to image for additional dates
minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 05/08 11:55 AM
Minute Entry for remote proceedings before District Judge Robert J. White: Scheduling Conference held on 5/8/2025. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (TVil)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
15 15 answer Answer to Counterclaim Mon 05/05 5:05 PM
ANSWER to Counterclaim with Affirmative Defenses by Berg Marketing Group, Inc.. (Andries, Henry)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
14 14 misc Discovery Plan - Rule 26f Thu 05/01 4:41 PM
DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Andries, Henry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
13 13 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/29 12:25 PM
STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Counterclaim ( Response due by 5/5/2025 ). Signed by District Judge Robert J. White. (TVil)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
12 12 misc Attorney Appearance Tue 04/08 2:15 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kristopher K. Hulliberger appearing on behalf of Market Performance Group, LLC (Hulliberger, Kristopher)
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/08 9:48 AM
ORDER Requiring Joint Discovery Plan and Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference ( Remote Scheduling Conference set for 5/8/2025 at 10:30 AM before District Judge Robert J. White ). Signed by District Judge Robert J. White. (TVil)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/07 4:45 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Market Performance Group, LLC. (Macik, Miles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit Acknowledgement
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Civil Case - Counterclaim Mon 04/07 2:19 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses , COUNTERCLAIM filed by Jason J Carik against Berg Marketing Group, Inc. by Jason J Carik. (Garcia, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
8 8 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/01 2:45 PM
STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Complaint ( Response due by 4/7/2025 ). Signed by District Judge Robert J. White. (TVil)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
7 7 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Tue 03/11 4:10 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Jason J Carik served on 3/9/2025, answer due 3/31/2025. (Andries, Henry)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Tue 03/11 4:09 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Market Performance Group, LLC served on 3/10/2025, answer due 3/31/2025. (Andries, Henry)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
5 5 2 pgs notice Appearance Mon 02/10 2:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L. Geller on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Geller, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
4 4 notice Practice Guidelines Fri 02/07 3:40 PM
Notice of District Judge Robert J. White's Case Management Requirements. (TVil)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued* Fri 02/07 3:35 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Market Performance Group, LLC* (SSch)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued* Fri 02/07 3:35 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Jason J Carik* (SSch)
Related: [-]
1 1 21 pgs cmp Civil Case - Complaint Fri 02/07 3:28 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Berg Marketing Group, Inc. against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-10110949 - Fee: $ 405. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Andries, Henry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 10 pgs Exhibit A - Agreement
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Fri 02/07 3:36 PM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (SSch)
Related: [-]