New Jersey District Court
Judge:Susan D Wigenton
Referred: Jose R Almonte
Case #: 2:25-cv-01099
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Feb 07, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 24, 2025 5:28 AM EDT
Defendant
MARY JONES 1-10
Defendant
KAREN MCGOWAN
Represented By
BRANDON REED SHER
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
MICHAEL JOSEPH WESTWOOD-BOOTH
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
BARRY STUART LITWIN
Represented By
BRANDON REED SHER
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
MICHAEL JOSEPH WESTWOOD-BOOTH
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
DANIEL LAMADRID
Represented By
BRANDON REED SHER
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
MICHAEL JOSEPH WESTWOOD-BOOTH
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
JOHN CAPELA
Represented By
BRANDON REED SHER
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
MICHAEL JOSEPH WESTWOOD-BOOTH
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-10
Defendant
ETHAN ISAAC
Represented By
BRANDON REED SHER
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
MICHAEL JOSEPH WESTWOOD-BOOTH
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
ROBERT FREDERICK HULL
Represented By
BRANDON REED SHER
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
MICHAEL JOSEPH WESTWOOD-BOOTH
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
IAN HELLER
Represented By
BRANDON REED SHER
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
MICHAEL JOSEPH WESTWOOD-BOOTH
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
MARK EDWARD EHLE
Represented By
BRANDON REED SHER
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
MICHAEL JOSEPH WESTWOOD-BOOTH
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
CORY MONGNO
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
JOSEPH ORENGO
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
TRAVIS OLSON
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
ANGELA VAN DRUTEN
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
JOHN NANTES
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
MELISSA MUNZ
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
JOHN MORRIS
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
ASHLEY MONTES
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
ANDREW WARREN
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
CORTNIE TANGO
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
ALEXIA MILONE
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
MARK METZINGER
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
EDGAR MENDOZA
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
LISA WILEY
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
KATE MCHALE
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
PAMELA WYMAN
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
SABEEN AFZAL
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
NICOLE SCHROEDER
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
ALISA STEWART
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
LAUREN PACINI
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
PER STERNER
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
VERONICA PALMISANO
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
BRENNA PHELAN
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
CANDACE PICZON
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
RYAN PUTMAN
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
NICOLE QUINLAN
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
CRAIG SMITH
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
CARMELLA ROMANIA
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
CHARLES ROMERO
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
NIENU ROY
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
ASHLEY RUPPEL
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
JASON SAKOWSKI
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
JESSICA SCHOENER
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
NICOLE CHMIELEWSKI
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
LORAWN DUPREE
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
MELISSA DINAPOLI
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
JENNIFER DIGIROLAMO
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
DONNA DALFONSO
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
JENSINE MAY DELA CRUZ
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
JENNIFER COLLINS
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
MARK COFONE
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
VINCENT CLEARY
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
ALYSSA LONGO
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
COLLEEN CELMER
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
DAWN CASALE
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
ALEXANDRA CAPPELLO
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
VERONICA BECKETT
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
MARIA BARRAZA
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
ISHITA AHMED
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
SAMANTHA ACEVEDO
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
KELLY FITZGERALD
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
TANIJUA MALCOLM-SARGEANT
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
WALTER LINSLEY
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
MELISSA LIBRANDI
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
POLINA LEWKOWICZ
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
KEVIN LAUTURNER
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
KARTIK KOLLURI
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
HYUN KIM
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
LARRY KIKUCHI
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
SHARON KEITH
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
VAIBHAV JAIN
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
MARK JACOBSON
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
KALEIGH HORDOF
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
SONIA GARZA
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
CHELSEA FLECKER
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
YESENIA FITZSIMMONS
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
JENNIFER EHLERS
Represented By
JULIE SALWEN
Harrison Harrison & Associates Ltd
contact info
DAVID HARRISON
Harrison Harrison & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, March 20, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order Thu 03/20 5:15 PM
LETTER ORDER granting the8 Letter, extending the stay in this matter until 7/3/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 3/20/2025. (wh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
8 8 misc Letter Wed 03/19 3:06 PM
Letter from Michael Westwood-Booth Esq. requesting the Court for extended Stay re7 Order, Order Staying Case.(WESTWOOD-BOOTH, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Signed Stipulation
Saturday, March 08, 2025
7 7 1 pgs order Order Order Staying Case Mon 03/10 12:08 PM
LETTER ORDER granting the6 Letter request to stay all deadlines in this matter for thirty days, until 4/3/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 3/7/2025. (wh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
6 6 misc Letter Thu 03/06 3:27 PM
Letter from Michael Westwood-Booth, Esq. requesting a Stay on all deadlines for 30 days.. (WESTWOOD-BOOTH, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/06 10:13 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL JOSEPH WESTWOOD-BOOTH on behalf of JOHN CAPELA, MARK EDWARD EHLE, IAN HELLER, ROBERT FREDERICK HULL, ETHAN ISAAC, DANIEL LAMADRID, BARRY STUART LITWIN, KAREN MCGOWAN (WESTWOOD-BOOTH, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/06 9:56 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by BRANDON REED SHER on behalf of JOHN CAPELA, MARK EDWARD EHLE, IAN HELLER, ROBERT FREDERICK HULL, ETHAN ISAAC, DANIEL LAMADRID, BARRY STUART LITWIN, KAREN MCGOWAN (SHER, BRANDON)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/13 1:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JULIE SALWEN on behalf of All Plaintiffs (SALWEN, JULIE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 02/11 9:24 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to JOHN CAPELA, MARK EDWARD EHLE, IAN HELLER, ROBERT FREDERICK HULL, ETHAN ISAAC, DANIEL LAMADRID, BARRY STUART LITWIN, KAREN MCGOWAN. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (wh)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Blank Diversity Disclosure Statement Tue 02/11 9:22 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court.[LINK:Click here] to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (wh)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Fillable PDF Tue 02/11 9:22 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The1 -2 Proposed Summons filed by DAVID HARRISON on 2/07/2025 was uploaded prior to being flattened. Before uploading fillable forms to ECF you must flatten the file to prevent other users from manipulating or editing the information. The easiest way to flatten a PDF form is by selecting Print to PDF and saving the flattened form, other PDF software may differ. Please visit our[LINK:website] under Flattening PDF Forms for guidance. Your document has been corrected. This message is for informational purposes only. (wh)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 02/10 9:00 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte. (mfr)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
1 1 39 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 02/07 3:59 PM
COMPLAINT against JOHN CAPELA, MARK EDWARD EHLE, IAN HELLER, ROBERT FREDERICK HULL, ETHAN ISAAC, JOHN DOES 1-10, DANIEL LAMADRID, BARRY STUART LITWIN, MARY JONES 1-10, KAREN MCGOWAN ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-16004757) with JURY DEMAND, filed by NICOLE QUINLAN, NICOLE CHMIELEWSKI, CHARLES ROMERO, LARRY KIKUCHI, JOHN NANTES, MARK COFONE, KATE MCHALE, JASON SAKOWSKI, TANIJUA MALCOLM-SARGEANT, ALYSSA LONGO, MARK JACOBSON, ANGELA VAN DRUTEN, CANDACE PICZON, KEVIN LAUTURNER, CRAIG SMITH, MELISSA MUNZ, NIENU ROY, DAWN CASALE, VERONICA PALMISANO, COLLEEN CELMER, MELISSA DINAPOLI, WALTER LINSLEY, RYAN PUTMAN, CHELSEA FLECKER, ASHLEY MONTES, SAMANTHA ACEVEDO, DONNA DALFONSO, ISHITA AHMED, ALEXANDRA CAPPELLO, BRENNA PHELAN, ANDREW WARREN, CORY MONGNO, TRAVIS OLSON, KELLY FITZGERALD, CARMELLA ROMANIA, ALISA STEWART, CORTNIE TANGO, KARTIK KOLLURI, JENNIFER COLLINS, JENNIFER DIGIROLAMO, MELISSA LIBRANDI, MARIA BARRAZA, MARK METZINGER, SABEEN AFZAL, HYUN KIM, ASHLEY RUPPEL, VINCENT CLEARY, LORAWN DUPREE, ALEXIA MILONE, LAUREN PACINI, SHARON KEITH, VAIBHAV JAIN, LISA WILEY, EDGAR MENDOZA, JOHN MORRIS, PAMELA WYMAN, JENNIFER EHLERS, KALEIGH HORDOF, YESENIA FITZSIMMONS, VERONICA BECKETT, JOSEPH ORENGO, POLINA LEWKOWICZ, JENSINE MAY DELA CRUZ, NICOLE SCHROEDER, PER STERNER, SONIA GARZA, JESSICA SCHOENER.(HARRISON, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons